This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 08/05/2016 at 17:57:58 (UTC).

FAGO VS JOHN

Case Summary

On 07/06/2015 FAGO filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JOHN. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Banning Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0235

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KENNETH M FAGO

Defendants

AUGUST CHARLES JOHN

PATRICIA JOHN

 

Court Documents

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT O

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; WHOLLY UNSATISFIED FILED.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY KENNETH M FAGO.

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECO

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 07/29/15 B201 HEARING OFFICER JUDITH M FOULADI).

JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT

JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED SIGNED BY HONORABLE HEARING OFFICER JUDITH M FOULADI.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: UN

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: UNLAWFUL DETAINER TRIAL.

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY KENNETH M FAGO - BANNING (FORM UD-150).

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY PATRICIA JOHN IS GRANTED; CLERK BA (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY AUGUST CHARLES JOHN IS GRANTED; CLERK BA (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF AN

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER ON KENNETH FAGO WITH A MAILING DATE OF 07/10/15 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER CO

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/06/2015 OF KENNETH FAGO BY AUGUST CHARLES JOHN, PATRICIA JOHN REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWF

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/06/2015 OF KENNETH FAGO SERVED ON AUGUST CHARLES JOHN WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/07/15 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWF

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/06/2015 OF KENNETH FAGO SERVED ON PATRICIA JOHN WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/07/15 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92223.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (BANNING)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2015
  • DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; WHOLLY UNSATISFIED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY KENNETH M FAGO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 07/29/15 B201 HEARING OFFICER JUDITH M FOULADI).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED SIGNED BY HONORABLE HEARING OFFICER JUDITH M FOULADI.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • COURT TRIAL UNLAWFUL DETAINER - BANNING; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: UNLAWFUL DETAINER TRIAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • COURT TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER SET FOR 7/29/15, AT 13:30 IN DEPT. B201.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY KENNETH M FAGO - BANNING (FORM UD-150).

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 07/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/06/2015 OF KENNETH FAGO SERVED ON AUGUST CHARLES JOHN WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/07/15 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/06/2015 OF KENNETH FAGO SERVED ON PATRICIA JOHN WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/07/15 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 9/04/15 AT 8:30 IN BCLRK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92223.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (BANNING)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT B201 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (BANNING)

    Read MoreRead Less