This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 02/02/2017 at 09:35:12 (UTC).

EVANS VS ELLIS

Case Summary

On 02/01/2016 EVANS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ELLIS. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0206

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EDWARD EVANS

Defendants

KEVIN ELLIS

JULIE CHAVEZ

Other

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF WILLIAM E WINDHAM

308 N Riverside Ave #2E

Rialto, CA 92376

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SA

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SATISFIED

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY EDWARD EVANS.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT A

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 02/01/2016 OF EDWARD EVANS AS TO KEVIN ELLIS, JULIE CHAVEZ, UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR R

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK -

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 02/23/16

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 02/01/2016 OF EDWARD EVANS AS TO JULIE CHAVEZ; MAILING DATE OF 02/03/16 FILED.

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 02/01/2016 OF EDWARD EVANS AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 02/03/16 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWF

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 02/01/2016 OF EDWARD EVANS SERVED ON KEVIN ELLIS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 02/03/16 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92530.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(SOUTHWEST)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2016
  • DocketDATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY EDWARD EVANS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 02/01/2016 OF EDWARD EVANS AS TO KEVIN ELLIS, JULIE CHAVEZ, UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 02/23/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 02/01/2016 OF EDWARD EVANS AS TO JULIE CHAVEZ; MAILING DATE OF 02/03/16 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 02/01/2016 OF EDWARD EVANS AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 02/03/16 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 02/01/2016 OF EDWARD EVANS SERVED ON KEVIN ELLIS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 02/03/16 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92530.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • DocketHEARING RE: UD OSC SET 4/01/16 AT 8:00 IN CLES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT S205 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less