This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/13/2016 at 13:17:47 (UTC).

ESTATE OF JOSE G. CASTRO

Case Summary

On 03/22/2011 ESTATE OF JOSE G CASTRO was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Temecula Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0162

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Not Classified By Court

MARY CASTRO ROBIE

Foothill Ranch, CA 92610

MICHAEL SOLOMON

ROSALIND CASTRO RUSSELL

Hermosa Beach, CA 90254

DORIS CASTRO LAWRENCE-OLIPHANT

Los Angeles, CA 90025

JOSEPH ANTHONY CASTRO

Laguna Hills, CA 92653

Decedent

JOSE G. CASTRO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LARSON, CHARLES L.

1283 North Tustin Ave.

Anaheim, CA 92807

 

Court Documents

PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINI

PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION - LIMITED-IAEA FILED.

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERS

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED (DE-147)

PROOF OF PUBLICATION OF NOTICE

PROOF OF PUBLICATION OF NOTICE OF PETN TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY MICHAEL SOLOMON, PROBATE

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINIST

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY MICHAEL SOLOMON WITH PROOF OF SERVICE. (DE-121)

REQUEST FOR SPECIAL NOTICE FIL

REQUEST FOR SPECIAL NOTICE FILED BY MARY CASTRO ROBIE. (DE-154/GC-035)

OBJECTIONS TO MICHAEL SOLOMON

OBJECTIONS TO MICHAEL SOLOMON PETN TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY MARY CASTRO ROBIE.

OBJECTIONS TO MICHAEL SOLOMON

OBJECTIONS TO MICHAEL SOLOMON PETN TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY ROSALIND CASTRO RUSSELL.

OBJECTIONS TO MICHAEL SOLOMON

OBJECTIONS TO MICHAEL SOLOMON PETN TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY DORIS CASTRO LAWRENCE-OLIPHANT.

OBJECTIONS TO PETN OF MICHAEL

OBJECTIONS TO PETN OF MICHAEL SOLOMON TO ADMIN ESTATE FILED BY JOSEPH ANTHONY CASTRO.

AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE FILED

AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DORIS CASTRO LAWRENCE-OLIPHANT

AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE FILED

AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ROSALIND CASTRO RUSSELL

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINIST

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY ROSALIND CASTRO RUSSELL WITH PROOF OF SERVICE. (DE-121)

SUBSEQUENT PETITION PROBATE OF

SUBSEQUENT PETITION PROBATE OF WILL & FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY FILED BY ROSALIND CASTRO RUSSELL.

WILL RECEIVED 06/03/11 DEPOSIT

WILL RECEIVED 06/03/11 DEPOSITED IN CASE FILE #MCP 1100162 TO BE FILED AFTER ADMITTANCE TO PROBATE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF PETN

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF PETN FOR LTRS OF ADMIN BY MICHAEL SOLOMON BY ATTY CHARLES LARSON - WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF PROBA

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF PROBATE PETITION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED.

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF PROBATE PETITION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2011
  • HEARING ON SUBSEQUENT MISCELLANEOUS PETITION PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY FILED ON 06/01/11; Disposition: Complete

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2011
  • HEARING ON SUBSEQUENT MISCELLANEOUS PETITION PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY FILED ON 06/01/11; Disposition: COntinued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2011
  • HEARING ON SUBSEQUENT MISCELLANEOUS PETITION PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY FILED ON 06/01/11; Disposition: COntinued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2011
  • HEARING ON SUBSEQUENT MISCELLANEOUS PETITION PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY FILED ON 06/01/11; Disposition: COntinued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2011
  • HEARING RE: PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION-LIMITED IAEA; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF PETN FOR LTRS OF ADMIN BY MICHAEL SOLOMON BY ATTY CHARLES LARSON - WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • WILL RECEIVED 06/03/11 DEPOSITED IN CASE FILE #MCP 1100162 TO BE FILED AFTER ADMITTANCE TO PROBATE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2011
  • HEARING ON SUBSEQUENT MISCELLANEOUS PETITION SET 7/01/11 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSEQUENT PETITION PROBATE OF WILL & FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY FILED BY ROSALIND CASTRO RUSSELL.

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 04/15/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • OBJECTIONS TO MICHAEL SOLOMON PETN TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY DORIS CASTRO LAWRENCE-OLIPHANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • OBJECTIONS TO MICHAEL SOLOMON PETN TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY ROSALIND CASTRO RUSSELL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • OBJECTIONS TO MICHAEL SOLOMON PETN TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY MARY CASTRO ROBIE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SPECIAL NOTICE FILED BY MARY CASTRO ROBIE. (DE-154/GC-035)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY MICHAEL SOLOMON WITH PROOF OF SERVICE. (DE-121)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF PUBLICATION OF NOTICE OF PETN TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY MICHAEL SOLOMON, PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2011
  • HEARING SET ON PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION-LIMITED IAEA SET ON 4/25/11 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED (DE-147)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2011
  • CONFIDENTIAL SUPPLEMENT TO DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AS TO MICHAEL SOLOMON. (DE-147S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION - LIMITED-IAEA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LARSON CHARLES L.