Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 01/08/2018 at 09:17:05 (UTC).

ESTATE OF JANA ROCHELLE NICOLAY

Case Summary

On 03/21/2017 ESTATE OF JANA ROCHELLE NICOLAY was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0192

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Palm Springs Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JEFFREY JAY NICOLAY

Decedent

JANA ROCHELLE NICOLAY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BEST, BEST & KRIEGER

74760 Highway 111, Ste 200

Indian Wells, CA 92210

 

Court Documents

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NO

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT.

NOTICE OF HEARING RE: SPOUSAL

NOTICE OF HEARING RE: SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETN & NTC O/ASSIGNMENT T/DEPT BY JEFFREY JAY NICOLAY FILED. (DE-120/GC-020)

SPOUSAL OR DOMESTIC PARTNER PR

SPOUSAL OR DOMESTIC PARTNER PROPERTY PETITION FILED. (DE-221 PROBATE)

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT (PRO

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT (PROBATE)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2017
  • CREDITOR'S CLAIM FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA NA IN THE AMOUNT OF $15,421.30. (DE-172)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • HEARING RE: SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETITION; Disposition: Advanced

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • CERTIFIED COPY(S) MADE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • SPOUSAL PROPERTY ORDER FILED; JUDGE JUDGE RANDALL D WHITE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • HEARING RE: SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETITION; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING RE:SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETN FILED BY JEFFREY JAY NICOLAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • EX PARTE ORDER ADVANCING HEARING DATE FILED BY JEFFREY JAY NICOLAY; JUDGE JUDGE JAMES A. COX.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • EX-PARTE RE MOTION FOR ORDER ADVANCING HEARING DATE FILED BY JEFFREY JAY NICOLAY REPRESENTED BY BEST, BEST & KRIEGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • DECLARATION OF JILL TREMBLAY RE: CERTIFICATE OF DEATH FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • HEARING RE: SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETITION; Disposition: COntinued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • SUPPLEMENT TO SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETITION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • NOTICE OF HEARING RE: SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETN & NTC O/ASSIGNMENT T/DEPT BY JEFFREY JAY NICOLAY FILED. (DE-120/GC-020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 1A (SPOUSAL OR DOMESTIC PARTNER PROPERTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • HEARING SET SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETITION ON 5/01/17 AT 8:45 IN DEPT 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • COURT REPORTER FEE (UNDER ONE HOUR) PAID BY JEFFEY JAY NICOLAY FOR HEARING 05/01/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT (PROBATE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • SPOUSAL OR DOMESTIC PARTNER PROPERTY PETITION FILED. (DE-221 PROBATE)

    Read MoreRead Less