This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/24/2016 at 04:38:17 (UTC).

EST OF TAYLOR

Case Summary

On 04/09/2003 EST OF TAYLOR was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8694

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Palm Springs Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

JAMES W MCDONNELL

DENNIS HOSKINS

Administrator

ENZO PROVENZA

Not Classified By Court

DOROTHY HOSKINS

ROBERT CHAVEZ

WALTER R NELSON

Decedent

RICHARD ALLAN TAYLOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Classified By Court Attorneys

NELSON, WALTER R

68132 Valley Vista Drive

Cathedral City, CA 92234

SLOVAK BARON & EMPEY LLP

1800 Tahquitz Canyon Way

Palm Springs, CA 92262

ARTER & HADDEN

52 Park Plaza Ste. 1000

Irvine, CA 92714

ANDRADE & HARGAN

18401 Von Karman Ave Suite 350

Irvine, CA 92715

HARLOW, SCOTT N.

225 S. Civic Drive Ste 215

Palm Springs, CA 92262

Administrator Attorney

KAHN, MICHAEL S.

901 E Tahquitz Cyn Way A-201 P.O.Box 2286

Palm Springs, CA 92263

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINIST

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY JAMES W MCDONNELL WITH PROOF OF SERVICE. (DE-121)

SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF WA

SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF WALTER R NELSON FILED

PETITION FOR LETTERS OF SPECIA

PETITION FOR LETTERS OF SPECIAL ADMINISTRATION FILED

REQUEST FOR SPECIAL NOTICE FIL

REQUEST FOR SPECIAL NOTICE FILED BY WALTER R NELSON. (DE-154/GC-035)

ORDER FOR OVERRULING DEMURRER

ORDER FOR OVERRULING DEMURRER TO OBJECTIONS OF D HOSKINS FILED BY DOROTHY HOSKINS; JUDGE JUDGE ROBERT G. TAYLOR

DECLARATION OF NOTICE OF EX PA

DECLARATION OF NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF EX

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF EX PARTE/NOTICE OF HRG/PET FOR ORDER CONFIRMING ON SEE ATTACHED MAILING LIST WITH MAILING DATE OF 10/31/03 FILED (NON-COMPLAINT)

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR CONT

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE TO 5-18-04 FILED BY DOROTHY HOSKINS; JUDGE ROBERT G. TAYLOR.

RETURN MAIL FOR DOROTHY HOSKIN

RETURN MAIL FOR DOROTHY HOSKINS AS TO COPY OF MINUTE ORDER PLACED IN FILE.

BOND POSTED - ENZO PROVENZA IN

BOND POSTED - ENZO PROVENZA IN THE AMOUNT OF $50000.00 POSTED.

REJECTION OF CREDITOR'S CLAIM

REJECTION OF CREDITOR'S CLAIM FILED BY ROBERT CHAVEZ IN THE AMOUNT OF $30.75 (DE-174)

INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL SUPPLE

INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL SUPPLEMENTAL ILED. (DE-160/GC-040)

DECLARATION OF ENZO G. PROVENZ

DECLARATION OF ENZO G. PROVENZA IN SUPPORT OF EXTRAORDINARY ATTORNEYS FEES FILED.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF ATTORNEY MICHAEL S KAHN FILED (FIRM ADDRESS PREVIOUSLY CHANGED IN SYSTEM)

OBJECTIONS TO PETITION FOR SET

OBJECTIONS TO PETITION FOR SETTLEMENT OF FIRST ACCOUNT FILED BY ROBERT CHAVEZ (NON-COMPLAINT)

RECEIPT FOR DISTRIBUTION FILED

RECEIPT FOR DISTRIBUTION FILED BY ENZO G. PROVENZA

RECEIPT FOR DISTRIBUTION FILED

RECEIPT FOR DISTRIBUTION FILED BY JAMES MC DONNELL

RECEIPT FOR DISTRIBUTION FILED

RECEIPT FOR DISTRIBUTION FILED BY DOROTHY HOSKINS

127 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • EX PARTE PETITION FOR FINAL DISCHARGE AND ORDER ON PETITION FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY FILED 04/09/2003 OF JAMES MCDONNELL AS TO ENZO PROVENZA; JUDGE JUDGE JAMES A COX.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT FOR DISTRIBUTION FILED BY ROBERT CASTRO CHAVEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT FOR DISTRIBUTION FILED BY DOROTHY HOSKINS (119.81 CASH)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT FOR DISTRIBUTION FILED BY DOROTHY HOSKINS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT FOR DISTRIBUTION FILED BY IDA JEAN TANNER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT FOR DISTRIBUTION FILED BY JAMES MCDONNELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT FOR DISTRIBUTION FILED BY ERNIE REDMOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF MICHAEL S. KAHN FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT OF/FOR ENZO G PROVENZA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT OF/FOR MICHAEL S KAHN FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
215 More Docket Entries
  • 05/08/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF WALTER R NELSON FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF PUBLICATION OF NOTICE OF PET TO ADMINSTER ESTATE FILED BY JAMES W MCDONNELL, PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY JAMES W MCDONNELL WITH PROOF OF SERVICE. (DE-121)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2003
  • HEARING ON PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY SET 5/13/03 AT 8:45 IN DEPT. 2G

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED (DE-147)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUBSCRIBING WITNESS (AFTER 12/84) FILED BY LANE B STANTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF JAMES W MCDONNELL RE CITEZENSHIP OF RICHARD ALLAN TAYLOR/ISSUE OF PREDECEASED CHILDREN FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2003
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • WILL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY - IAEA (10500PRC) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.