Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 02/02/2017 at 19:11:45 (UTC).

ESSEX JMS ACQUISITION LP VS MINERVA

Case Summary

On 08/15/2016 ESSEX JMS ACQUISITION LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MINERVA. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Hemet Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1611

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hemet Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ESSEX JMS ACQUISITION LP

Defendant

HARNA MINERVA

Hemet, CA 92545

Other

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBALL TIREY & STJOHN LLP

2040 Main Street Suite 500

Irvine, CA 92614

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (HEMET)

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92545.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DET

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/15/2016 OF ESSEX JMS ACQUISITION LP AND FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWF

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/15/2016 OF ESSEX JMS ACQUISITION LP SERVED ON HARNA MINERVA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/17/16 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR R

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT A

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/15/2016 OF ESSEX JMS ACQUISITION LP AS TO HARNA MINERVA, UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/15/2016 OF ESSEX JMS ACQUISITION LP AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 08/17/16 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK -

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 08/30/16

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY ESSEX JMS ACQUISITION LP.

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT O

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; SATISFIED FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2016
  • DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; SATISFIED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY ESSEX JMS ACQUISITION LP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 08/30/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/15/2016 OF ESSEX JMS ACQUISITION LP AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 08/17/16 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/15/2016 OF ESSEX JMS ACQUISITION LP AS TO HARNA MINERVA, UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/15/2016 OF ESSEX JMS ACQUISITION LP SERVED ON HARNA MINERVA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/17/16 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 10/14/16 AT 8:00 IN CLEH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION ATTACHED TO THE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/15/2016 OF ESSEX JMS ACQUISITION LP AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92545.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (HEMET)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT H1 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (HEMET)

    Read MoreRead Less