This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/11/2018 at 14:41:41 (UTC).

ESQUIVEL VS ZAVALA

Case Summary

On 05/08/2015 ESQUIVEL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ZAVALA. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5523

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAIME ESQUIVEL

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

JOSE JAVIER ZAVALA

FEDERICO GARCIA

DAVID RIVERA

ROSA RIVERA

GALINDO SALVADOR REYES

TRIMMING LAND COMANY INC

TRIMMING LAND CO INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MORIARITY & ASSOCIATES

5850 Canoga Avenue 4Th Floor

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

DALL LAW FIRM

26440 La Alameda #380

Mission Viejo, CA 92691

GRAVES & KING LLP

3610 Fourteenth Street Second Floor

Riverside, CA 92501-3837

MESSINA LALFARIAN MENDEL & RYAN

550 North Brand Boulevard Suite 1670

Glendale, CA 91203

FARMER CASE & FEDOR

402 W. Broadway #1100

San Diego, CA 92101

YOKA & SMITH, LLP

445 S. Figueroa St., 38Th Fl.

Los Angeles, CA 90071

LAW OFFICES OF PATRICK J MCDONOUGH

3633 E Inland Empire Blvd #450 Po Box 51457

Ontario, CA 91764

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PRE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 10/20/2015 OF DAVID RIVERA FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92509.

SUMMONS FILED.

SUMMONS FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 05/08/2015 OF JAIME ESQUIVEL SERVED ON GALINDO SALVADOR REYES WITH SERVICE DATE OF 05/20/15 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/08/2015 OF JAIME ESQUIVEL AS TO TRIMMING LAND COMANY INC; MAILING DATE OF 06/02/15 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/08/2015 OF JAIME ESQUIVEL AS TO FEDERICO GARCIA; MAILING DATE OF 06/12/15 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 05/08/2015 OF JAIME ESQUIVEL SERVED ON JOSE JAVIER ZAVALA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/12/15 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL BY JOSE

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL BY JOSE JAVIER ZAVALA, FEDERICO GARCIA FILED

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILE

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 07/17/2015 OF JOSE ZAVALA BY GALINDO SALVADOR REYES, TRIMMING LAND CO INC REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICES OF PATRICK J MCDONOUGH FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CROSS

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 07/02/2015 OF GALINDO REYES SERVED ON JOSE JAVIER ZAVALA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/17/15 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILE

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 07/02/2015 OF GALINDO REYES BY JOSE JAVIER ZAVALA, FEDERICO GARCIA REPRESENTED BY DALL LAW FIRM FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

NOTICE OF ERRATE IN CROSS-COMP

NOTICE OF ERRATE IN CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR IDEMNITY CONTRIBUTION, DECL RELIEF, BY JOSE JAVIER ZAVALA, FEDERICO GARCIA FILED.

NOTICE OF LIEN FILED ON COMPLA

NOTICE OF LIEN FILED ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/08/2015 OF JAIME ESQUIVEL AGAINST JAIME ESQUIVEL BY COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES DEPT.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY JAIME ESQUIVEL

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY J

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY JOSE JAVIER ZAVALA, FEDERICO GARCIA FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNS

NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL BY GALINDO SALVADOR REYES, TRIMMING LAND CO INC FILED.

NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS

NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS ENTIRE CASE - OTHER: CIRCUIT COURT OF COOK COUNTY ILLINOIS BY DAVID RIVERA, ROSA RIVERA FILED (FORM CM-180).

ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL ON THE

ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 05/08/2015 OF JAIME ESQUIVEL AS TO DEFENDANT JOSE JAVIER ZAVALA, FEDERICO GARCIA ADDING ATTORNEY GRAVES & KING LLP FILED.

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2018
  • JURY TRIAL; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • NUNC PRO TUNC HEARING; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO COMPLAINT OF JAIME ESQUIVEL FILED. FILED ON 01/22/18 BY JAIME ESQUIVEL WAS CORRECTED NUNC PRO TUNC ON 05/22/18.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • NUNC PRO TUNC HEARING SET FOR 5/22/18 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(B).; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 07/02/2015 OF GALINDO REYES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 07/17/2015 OF JOSE ZAVALA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 10/20/2015 OF DAVID RIVERA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(B).; Disposition: Off-Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
56 More Docket Entries
  • 07/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 05/08/2015 OF JAIME ESQUIVEL BY GALINDO SALVADOR REYES, TRIMMING LAND CO INC REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICES OF PATRICK J MCDONOUGH FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • TRIMMING LAND CO INC ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS TRIMMING LAND COMANY INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 05/08/2015 OF JAIME ESQUIVEL SERVED ON JOSE JAVIER ZAVALA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/12/15 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/08/2015 OF JAIME ESQUIVEL AS TO FEDERICO GARCIA; MAILING DATE OF 06/12/15 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/08/2015 OF JAIME ESQUIVEL AS TO TRIMMING LAND COMANY INC; MAILING DATE OF 06/02/15 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 05/08/2015 OF JAIME ESQUIVEL SERVED ON GALINDO SALVADOR REYES WITH SERVICE DATE OF 05/20/15 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92509.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2015
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 06. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less