This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 08/01/2016 at 09:47:13 (UTC).

ESA TEMECULA VS BRYD

Case Summary

On 06/25/2014 ESA TEMECULA filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BRYD. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Temecula Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1432

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Temecula Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ESA TEMECULA

Defendants

FAYRENE BRYD

FAYRENE BYRD

Temecula, CA 92590

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LECLAIRRYAN LLP

725 S Figueroa St #350

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (TEMECULA)

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92590.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER CO

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/25/2014 OF ESA TEMECULA BY FAYRENE BYRD REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF AN

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF ANSWER ON VIKRAM SUBRAMANIAN WITH A MAILING DATE OF 06/27/14 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY FAYRENE BYRD IS GRANTED; CLERK J PRENDERGAST (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY ESA TEMECULA - TEMECULA (FORM UD-150).

TRIAL BRIEF FILED BY ESA TEMEC

TRIAL BRIEF FILED BY ESA TEMECULA

JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT

JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED SIGNED BY HONORABLE COMMISSIONER JOAN F BURGESS.

EXHIBIT LIST FILED

EXHIBIT LIST FILED

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECO

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 08/15/14 T1 COMMISSIONER JOAN F BURGESS).

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY ESA TEMECULA.

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT O

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; SATISFIED FILED.

RECEIPT FOR EXHIBITS FILED BY

RECEIPT FOR EXHIBITS FILED BY EXHIBITS CLERK FROM DEPARTMENT T1.

NOTICE OF DESTRUCTION OF EXHIB

NOTICE OF DESTRUCTION OF EXHIBITS.

ORDER FOR DESTRUCTION OF EXHIB

ORDER FOR DESTRUCTION OF EXHIBITS SIGNED BY JUDGE HAROLD W HOPP FILED.

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2015
  • CLERK'S CALENDAR - REVIEW EXHIBIT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER FOR DESTRUCTION OF EXHIBITS SIGNED BY JUDGE HAROLD W HOPP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2015
  • PLA EXHIBIT 1 DESTROYED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2015
  • CLERK'S CALENDAR - REVIEW EXHIBIT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2014
  • RETURN MAIL RECEIVED FOR NOTICE OF DESTRUCTION OF EXHIBITS AS TO FAYRENE BYRD; REASON RETURNED: UNABLE TO FORWARD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DESTRUCTION OF EXHIBITS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2014
  • CLERK'S CALENDER - REVIEW EXHIBIT STATUS SET 2/10/15 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. SWEXH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2014
  • CLERK'S CALENDER - REVIEW EXHIBIT STATUS SET 3/16/15 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. SWEXH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT FOR EXHIBITS FILED BY EXHIBITS CLERK FROM DEPARTMENT T1.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; SATISFIED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 06/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/25/2014 OF ESA TEMECULA BY FAYRENE BYRD REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • FAYRENE BYRD ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS FAYRENE BRYD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2014
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 8/25/14 AT 8:00 IN TCLRK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92590.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2014
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (TEMECULA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2014
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT T1 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (TEMECULA)

    Read MoreRead Less