This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/20/2017 at 15:50:08 (UTC).

ESA MANAGEMENT VA DESAULNIERS

Case Summary

On 06/02/2017 ESA MANAGEMENT VA DESAULNIERS was filed as a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0902

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Murrieta Southwest Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ESA MANAGEMENT, LLC

Defendant

SUZETTE DESAULNIERS

Other

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LECLAIR RYAN LLP

725 South Figueroa St Suite 350

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SA

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SATISFIED

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(SOUTHWEST)

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92590.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DET

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/02/2017 OF ESA MANAGEMENT, LLC AND FILED.

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR POST

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; HONORABLE JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, U

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/02/2017 OF ESA MANAGEMENT, LLC AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO SUZETTE DESAULNIERS BY POSTING AND MAILING ON DATE OF 06/23/17.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PREJUDGMEN

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/02/2017 OF ESA MANAGEMENT, LLC ON UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S) POSTED AND MAILED ON 06/23/17

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT A

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/02/2017 OF ESA MANAGEMENT, LLC AS TO SUZETTE DESAULNIERS, UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR R

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK -

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 07/12/17

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY ESA MANAGEMENT, LLC.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY ESA MANAGEMENT, LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 07/12/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/02/2017 OF ESA MANAGEMENT, LLC AS TO SUZETTE DESAULNIERS, UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/02/2017 OF ESA MANAGEMENT, LLC ON UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S) POSTED AND MAILED ON 06/23/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/02/2017 OF ESA MANAGEMENT, LLC AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO SUZETTE DESAULNIERS BY POSTING AND MAILING ON DATE OF 06/23/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; HONORABLE JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • FEE PAID FOR ORDER FOR POSTING/PUBLICATION (SUMMONS) BY ESA MANAGEMENT, LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/02/2017 OF ESA MANAGEMENT, LLC AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92590.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 8/02/17 AT 8:00 IN CLES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT S205 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.