This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/11/2021 at 12:12:45 (UTC).

FOSTER VS CITY OF INDIO

Case Summary

On 07/02/2015 FOSTER filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against CITY OF INDIO. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ronald L Johnson and James T Latting. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3048

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ronald L Johnson

James T Latting

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ERNEST FOSTER SR

RAYMOND FOSTER

ALONZO FOSTER

SANDRA JORDAN

MONIQUE FOSTER

ERNEST FOSTER, SR

Defendants

CITY OF INDIO

INDIO POLICE DEPARTMENT

RICHARD TWISS

OFFICER JEREMY HELLAWELL

Minor and Plaintiff

MONIQUE FOSTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Minor Attorneys

FILER PALMER LLP

249 E. Ocean Blvd. #501

Long Beach, CA 90802

SIAS CARR LLP

9701 Wilshire Blvd 10Th Floor #282

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

FILER PALMER LLP SIAS CARR LLP

Attorney at FILER PALMER LLP SIAS CARR LLP

Defendant Attorneys

MCCORMICK MITCHELL& RASMUSSEN

8885 Rio San Diego Dr #227

San Diego, CA 92108

MCCORMICK MITCHELL & RASMUSSEN

Attorney at MCCORMICK MITCHELL & RASMUSSEN

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal WITH prejudice Entire Action

04/30/2019: Request for Dismissal WITH prejudice Entire Action

System Generated Notice re: OSC RE: DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE.

02/22/2019: System Generated Notice re: OSC RE: DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE.

Notice of Settlement of Entire Case filed - Unconditional Settlement CRC 3.1385 [Form CM 200].

02/22/2019: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case filed - Unconditional Settlement CRC 3.1385 [Form CM 200].

Legacy Minute Order: Hearing Re: status regarding federal case and stay

01/29/2019: Legacy Minute Order: Hearing Re: status regarding federal case and stay

Minute Order: Changes to OSC & Status Hearing 1/29/19

01/25/2019: Minute Order: Changes to OSC & Status Hearing 1/29/19

Filed: JOINT STATUS REPORT

01/22/2019: Filed: JOINT STATUS REPORT

Legacy Minute Order: Ex Parte Hearing re TO VACATE SANCTIONS ORDER.

01/09/2019: Legacy Minute Order: Ex Parte Hearing re TO VACATE SANCTIONS ORDER.

Minute Order: EXPARTE RE VACATE SANCTIONS

01/08/2019: Minute Order: EXPARTE RE VACATE SANCTIONS

Declaration of SERVICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION & PROP ORDER filed

01/07/2019: Declaration of SERVICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION & PROP ORDER filed

Ex Parte Application to/for VACATE SANCTIONS ORDER by CITY OF INDIO, RICHARD TWISS, OFFICER JEREMY HELLAWELL filed

01/07/2019: Ex Parte Application to/for VACATE SANCTIONS ORDER by CITY OF INDIO, RICHARD TWISS, OFFICER JEREMY HELLAWELL filed

Legacy Minute Order: Hearing Re OSC re $1500 Sanctions per CCP 177.5 re 10/23/18 order re Status Report

12/27/2018: Legacy Minute Order: Hearing Re OSC re $1500 Sanctions per CCP 177.5 re 10/23/18 order re Status Report

Legacy Minute Order: Hearing Re: status regarding federal case and stay

12/27/2018: Legacy Minute Order: Hearing Re: status regarding federal case and stay

Minute Order: Change to Order to Show Cause Hearings on 12/27/18

12/24/2018: Minute Order: Change to Order to Show Cause Hearings on 12/27/18

Legacy Minute Order: Hearing Re: status regarding federal case and stay

11/28/2018: Legacy Minute Order: Hearing Re: status regarding federal case and stay

Minute Order: re 11/28/18 Status Conference

11/27/2018: Minute Order: re 11/28/18 Status Conference

Legacy Minute Order: Hearing Re: status regarding federal case and stay

10/26/2018: Legacy Minute Order: Hearing Re: status regarding federal case and stay

Minute Order: re 10/26/18 Status Conference

10/23/2018: Minute Order: re 10/26/18 Status Conference

Notice of Case Reassignment for Case Management and Trial Assignment Purposes

06/29/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment for Case Management and Trial Assignment Purposes

85 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2019
  • HearingType: Hearing on OSC Re: Dismissal After Unconditional Settlement Pursuant to CRC 3.1385(b).; Location/Courtroom: Department 1; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Shipping costs for transcripts for civil cases on appeal/Returning file stamped copies of documents by fax (CRC10.815); Amount: $4.00; Paid: $4.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 04/30/2019; Fine Description: American Express Receipt No.: CV190430-0042-AE.1; Paid: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Dismissal WITH prejudice Entire Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • HearingType: Hearing Re: status regarding federal case and stay; Location/Courtroom: Department 1; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: OSC RE: DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case filed - Unconditional Settlement CRC 3.1385 [Form CM 200].

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • HearingType: Hearing Re OSC re $1500 Sanctions per CCP 177.5 re 10/23/18 order re Status Report; Location/Courtroom: Department 1; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • HearingType: Hearing Re: status regarding federal case and stay; Location/Courtroom: Department 1; Disposition: Continued - Not Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Legacy Minute Order: Hearing Re: status regarding federal case and stay

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: Minute Order: Changes to OSC & Status Hearing 1/29/19

    Read MoreRead Less
100 More Docket Entries
  • 09/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Hearing GEN DMRRR&SPCL DMRRR TO COMPLAINT filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Judicial Notice filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Memo of Points & Authorities in IN SUPPORT OF GENERAL DEMURRER AND SPECIAL DEMURRER by CITY OF INDIO;RP TWISS;J HELLAWELL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Demurrer to Complaint of FOSTER by CITY OF INDIO, RICHARD TWISS, OFFICER JEREMY HELLAWELL represented by MCCORMICK MITCHELL & RASMUSSEN filed.; Filed By: CITY OF INDIO; RICHARD TWISS; OFFICER JEREMY HELLAWELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Plaintiff MONIQUE FOSTER named as SANDRA JORDAN is Granted; Honorable Judge Ronald L Johnson.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/02/2015; Fine Description: Check #36155 Receipt No.: CV150702-0400-CK.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92201.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: Notice of Case Assigned to Department PS2. (Palm Springs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Palm Springs)

    Read MoreRead Less