Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/20/2017 at 09:31:16 (UTC).

ERLICH VS FORD/MORENO

Case Summary

On 02/06/2017 ERLICH filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against FORD/MORENO. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Hemet Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0235

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hemet Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PHIL ERLICH

Hemet, CA 92543

Defendants

BIANCA MORENO

Hemet, CA 92543

QUINWION FORD

Hemet, CA 92543

Other

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (HEMET)

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92543.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF AN

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF ANSWER-UNLAWFUL DETAINER ON PHILO ERLICH WITH A MAILING DATE OF 02/15/17 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY QUINWION FORD IS GRANTED; CLERK A.VALENCIA (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY BIANCA MORENO IS GRANTED; CLERK A.VALENCIA (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWF

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 02/06/2017 OF PHIL ERLICH SERVED ON BIANCA MORENO WITH SERVICE DATE OF 02/08/17 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWF

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 02/06/2017 OF PHIL ERLICH SERVED ON QUINWION FORD WITH SERVICE DATE OF 02/08/17 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: UN

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: UNLAWFUL DETAINER TRIAL.

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY PHIL ERLICH - HEMET (FORM UD-150).

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 02/06/2017 OF PHIL ERLICH AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S) FILED.

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 02/06/2017 OF PHIL ERLICH AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 02/08/17 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT

JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED SIGNED BY HONORABLE COMMISSIONER KATHLEEN M. JACOBS.

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECO

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR FILED. (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 03/08/17 H1 COMMISSIONER KATHLEEN M. JACOBS)

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 02/06/2017 OF PHIL ERLICH REMOVE ATTORNEY LAW OFFICES OF WILLIAM E WINDHAM FOR PARTY(S) PHIL ERLICH AND REPLACE WITH ATTORNEY PRO/PER

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY PHIL ERLICH.

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT O

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; SATISFIED FILED.

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2017
  • DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; SATISFIED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY PHIL ERLICH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 02/06/2017 OF PHIL ERLICH REMOVE ATTORNEY LAW OFFICES OF WILLIAM E WINDHAM FOR PARTY(S) PHIL ERLICH AND REPLACE WITH ATTORNEY PRO/PER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR FILED. (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 03/08/17 H1 COMMISSIONER KATHLEEN M. JACOBS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED SIGNED BY HONORABLE COMMISSIONER KATHLEEN M. JACOBS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • COURT TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (HEMET) SET; Disposition: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 02/06/2017 OF PHIL ERLICH REMOVE ATTORNEY PRO/PER FOR PARTY(S) PHIL ERLICH AND REPLACE WITH ATTORNEY LAW OFFICES OF WILLIAM E WINDHAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 02/06/2017 OF PHIL ERLICH AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 02/08/17 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 02/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF ANSWER-UNLAWFUL DETAINER ON PHILO ERLICH WITH A MAILING DATE OF 02/15/17 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 4/07/17 AT 8:00 IN CLEH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 02/06/2017 OF PHIL ERLICH AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92543.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION ATTACHED TO THE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (HEMET)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT H1 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (HEMET)

    Read MoreRead Less