This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 06/11/2018 at 19:58:58 (UTC).

EQUITY RESIDENTIAL VS. HARMON

Case Summary

On 07/05/2002 EQUITY RESIDENTIAL filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against HARMON. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Corona Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7598

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EQUITY RESIDENTIAL

Defendant

SHELLEY HARMON

Other

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF EDWARD M PALMER

229 N. Riverside Ave

Rialto, CA 92377

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WR

APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED (FORM RI-003).

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/05/2002 OF EQUITY RESIDENTIAL AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S) FILED.

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/05/2002 OF EQUITY RESIDENTIAL AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S); AND MAILED ON 07/07/02 FILED.

JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT

JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED SIGNED BY HONORABLE COMMISSIONER STUART GLICKMAN.

STIPULATION FOR THE APPOINTMEN

STIPULATION FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS TEMPORARY JUDGE FILED.

REQUEST TO SET UNLAWFUL DETAIN

REQUEST TO SET UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY EQUITY RESIDENTIAL

ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON UNLAWFUL D

ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/05/2002 OF EQUITY RESIDENTIAL RETURNED AND FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWF

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/05/2002 OF EQUITY RESIDENTIAL SERVED ON SHELLEY HARMON WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/07/02 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER CO

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/05/2002 OF EQUITY RESIDENTIAL BY SHELLEY HARMON REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. (OVER $10,000)

FILED; CLERKS NOTICE OF COMPLA

FILED; CLERKS NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER.

LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINE

LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2002
  • DocketOSC RE: DISMISSAL OF CASE - CORONA; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED (FORM RI-003).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2002
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR THE COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/05/2002 OF EQUITY RESIDENTIAL AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S) FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/05/2002 OF EQUITY RESIDENTIAL AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S); AND MAILED ON 07/07/02 FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2002
  • DocketCOURT TRIAL - CORONA; Disposition: Judgment Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED SIGNED BY HONORABLE COMMISSIONER STUART GLICKMAN.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS TEMPORARY JUDGE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2002
  • DocketCOURT TRIAL SET ON 7/26/02 AT 11:00 IN DIV C3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO SET UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY EQUITY RESIDENTIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL SUMMONS ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/05/2002 OF EQUITY RESIDENTIAL RETURNED AND FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/05/2002 OF EQUITY RESIDENTIAL SERVED ON SHELLEY HARMON WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/07/02 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/05/2002 OF EQUITY RESIDENTIAL BY SHELLEY HARMON REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. (OVER $10,000)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFILED; CLERKS NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2002
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE SET 9/03/02 AT 11:00 IN DEPT. C3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2002
  • DocketPREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION ATTACHED TO THE COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Equity Residential Management LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EDWARD M PALMER