This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/28/2022 at 17:17:31 (UTC).

EQUABLE ASCENT FINANCIAL LLC VS WILLIAMS

Case Summary

On 01/16/2013 EQUABLE ASCENT FINANCIAL LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WILLIAMS. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Banning Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0075

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EQUABLE ASCENT FINANCIALLLC

Defendant

ELNORSIE L WILLIAMS

Not Yet Classified

CALVARY SPV I LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Not Yet Classified Attorney

LEGAL RECOVERY LAW OFFICES INC

Attorney at LEGAL RECOVERY LAW OFFICES INC

 

Court Documents

Legacy Minute Order: Hearing re: Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be issued against Plaintiff for Failure to file Default Judgment pursuant to CRC 3.740 (Banning).

01/22/2014: Legacy Minute Order: Hearing re: Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be issued against Plaintiff for Failure to file Default Judgment pursuant to CRC 3.740 (Banning).

Final Return to Court - Writ of EXECUTION as to Los Angeles County; UNSATISFIED filed.

01/28/2016: Final Return to Court - Writ of EXECUTION as to Los Angeles County; UNSATISFIED filed.

Memorandum of Credits of $0.00.

02/13/2015: Memorandum of Credits of $0.00.

RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION LA COUNTY-UNSATISFIED

10/07/2014: RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION LA COUNTY-UNSATISFIED

Memorandum of Credits of $0.00.

11/15/2013: Memorandum of Credits of $0.00.

Memorandum of Credits of $0.00.

10/21/2013: Memorandum of Credits of $0.00.

Notice of Assignment of Judgment on Complaint (Collection - Banning) of EQUABLE ASCENT FINANCIALLLC for EQUABLE ASCENT FINANCIAL LLC assigned to CALVARY SPV I LLC filed.

09/12/2013: Notice of Assignment of Judgment on Complaint (Collection - Banning) of EQUABLE ASCENT FINANCIALLLC for EQUABLE ASCENT FINANCIAL LLC assigned to CALVARY SPV I LLC filed.

first declaration (CCP 585(a))

04/09/2013: first declaration (CCP 585(a))

Judgment by Default by Clerk filed 04/09/13

04/09/2013: Judgment by Default by Clerk filed 04/09/13

memorandum of points and authorities supporting a clerk judgment

04/09/2013: memorandum of points and authorities supporting a clerk judgment

second declaration (CCP 585(a))

04/09/2013: second declaration (CCP 585(a))

Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes on the Complaint (Collection - Banning) of EQUABLE ASCENT FINANCIALLLC filed.

04/09/2013: Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes on the Complaint (Collection - Banning) of EQUABLE ASCENT FINANCIALLLC filed.

Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment on the Complaint (Collection - Banning) of EQUABLE ASCENT FINANCIALLLC as to ELNORSIE L WILLIAMS filed.

04/09/2013: Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment on the Complaint (Collection - Banning) of EQUABLE ASCENT FINANCIALLLC as to ELNORSIE L WILLIAMS filed.

Proof of Service on the Complaint (Collection - Banning) of EQUABLE ASCENT FINANCIALLLC served on ELNORSIE L WILLIAMS with service date of 01/19/13 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint (Collection - Banning) of EQUABLE ASCENT FINANCIALLLC

01/28/2013: Proof of Service on the Complaint (Collection - Banning) of EQUABLE ASCENT FINANCIALLLC served on ELNORSIE L WILLIAMS with service date of 01/19/13 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint (Collection - Banning) of EQUABLE ASCENT FINANCIALLLC

Affidavit OF VENUE by ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF filed

01/16/2013: Affidavit OF VENUE by ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF filed

Declaration re: BP 63221 filed by ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF

01/16/2013: Declaration re: BP 63221 filed by ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF

System Generated Notice re: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING.

01/16/2013: System Generated Notice re: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING.

System Generated Notice re: OF ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT.

01/16/2013: System Generated Notice re: OF ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT.

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Final Return to Court - Writ of EXECUTION as to Los Angeles County; UNSATISFIED filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2015
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Issuing writ for enforcement of order of judgment, writ of execution; abstract of judgment; certificate of satisfaction of judgment; certifying copy of paper, record, or proceeding on file; taking affidavit; etc. (GC 70626A1-8); Amount: $25.00; Paid: $25.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 02/13/2015; Fine Description: Check #9759 Receipt No.: CV150213-0081-CK.1; Paid: $25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Memorandum of Credits of $0.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION LA COUNTY-UNSATISFIED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2014
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be issued against Plaintiff for Failure to file Default Judgment pursuant to CRC 3.740 (Banning).; Location/Courtroom: Department B1; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Legacy Minute Order: Hearing re: Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be issued against Plaintiff for Failure to file Default Judgment pursuant to CRC 3.740 (Banning).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Memorandum of Credits of $0.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2013
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Issuing writ for enforcement of order of judgment, writ of execution; abstract of judgment; certificate of satisfaction of judgment; certifying copy of paper, record, or proceeding on file; taking affidavit; etc. (GC 70626A1-8); Amount: $25.00; Paid: $25.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/21/2013; Fine Description: Check #5667 Receipt No.: CV131021-0281-CK.1; Paid: $25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Memorandum of Credits of $0.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Assignment of Judgment on Complaint (Collection - Banning) of EQUABLE ASCENT FINANCIALLLC for EQUABLE ASCENT FINANCIAL LLC assigned to CALVARY SPV I LLC filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on the Complaint (Collection - Banning) of EQUABLE ASCENT FINANCIALLLC served on ELNORSIE L WILLIAMS with service date of 01/19/13 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint (Collection - Banning) of EQUABLE ASCENT FINANCIALLLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2013
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited complaint or other first paper, small claims (B&P6322.1C); Amount: $211.00; Paid: $211.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/16/2013; Fine Description: Check #5625 Receipt No.: CV130116-0248-CK.1; Paid: $211.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Affidavit OF VENUE by ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration re: BP 63221 filed by ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: OF ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92220.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Banning) of EQUABLE ASCENT FINANCIALLLC and filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Assignee Declaration CRC 3.740 filed. (Banning)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2013
  • DocketFilings: Complaint (Collection - Banning) of EQUABLE ASCENT FINANCIALLLC; Disposition: Complete 04/09/2013

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Equable Ascent Financial LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A. is a litigant