This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 06/11/2018 at 20:48:15 (UTC).

ENRIQUEZ VS MORA

Case Summary

On 07/29/2002 ENRIQUEZ filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MORA. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Corona Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7759

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALICIA ENRIQUEZ

Defendants

KAREN MORA

ROBERT CELIS

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION FOR THE APPOINTMEN

STIPULATION FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS TEMPORARY JUDGE FILED.

STIPULATION FOR THE APPOINTMEN

STIPULATION FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS TEMPORARY JUDGE FILED.

ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR WAIVE

ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF FEES/COSTS AS TO ROBERT CELIS IS DENIED; HONORABLE COMMISSIONER STUART E GLICKMAN.; Disposition: Denied

ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR WAIVE

ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF FEES/COSTS AS TO KAREN MORA IS DENIED; HONORABLE COMMISSIONER STUART E GLICKMAN.; Disposition: Denied

REQUEST TO SET UNLAWFUL DETAIN

REQUEST TO SET UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY ALICIA ENRIQUEZ

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER CO

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/29/2002 OF ALICIA ENRIQUEZ BY KAREN MORA REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. (OVER $10,000)

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER CO

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/29/2002 OF ALICIA ENRIQUEZ BY ROBERT CELIS REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. (OVER $10,000)

SUMMONS AND PROOF OF SERVICE O

SUMMONS AND PROOF OF SERVICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/29/2002 OF ALICIA ENRIQUEZ ON KAREN MORA, ROBERT CELIS SERVICE DATE OF 07/23/02 (PERSONALLY SERVED)

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINE

LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2002
  • DocketOSC RE: DISMISSAL OF CASE - CORONA; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2002
  • DocketREJECTED DOCUMENT: JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT FOR UD SUBMITTED BY ALICIA ENRIQUEZ.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2002
  • DocketJUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL REC'D & FORWD TO DEPT. COMM GLICKMAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2002
  • DocketJUDGMENT REC'D & FORWD TO DEPT. C2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2002
  • DocketCOURT TRIAL - CORONA; Disposition: Judgment Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS TEMPORARY JUDGE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS TEMPORARY JUDGE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2002
  • DocketCOURT TRIAL - CORONA; Disposition: Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF FEES/COSTS AS TO ROBERT CELIS IS DENIED; HONORABLE COMMISSIONER STUART E GLICKMAN.; Disposition: Denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF FEES/COSTS AS TO KAREN MORA IS DENIED; HONORABLE COMMISSIONER STUART E GLICKMAN.; Disposition: Denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/05/2002
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF FEES/COSTS FILED BY ROBERT CELIS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2002
  • DocketAPPLICATION 8/05/02 FOR WAIVER OF FEES PENDING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/29/2002 OF ALICIA ENRIQUEZ BY KAREN MORA REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. (OVER $10,000)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/29/2002 OF ALICIA ENRIQUEZ BY ROBERT CELIS REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. (OVER $10,000)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS AND PROOF OF SERVICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/29/2002 OF ALICIA ENRIQUEZ ON KAREN MORA, ROBERT CELIS SERVICE DATE OF 07/23/02 (PERSONALLY SERVED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2002
  • DocketFILED: NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2002
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE SET 9/27/02 AT 11:00 IN DEPT. C3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2002
  • DocketPREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION ATTACHED TO THE COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less