This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/20/2017 at 18:40:35 (UTC).

ENCANTO VS TUCK

Case Summary

On 07/18/2017 ENCANTO filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against TUCK. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1201

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Murrieta Southwest Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ENCANTO APARTMENT HOMES LP

Defendant

TOUREY TUCK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBALL TIREY & STJOHN LLP

2040 Main Street Suite 500

Irvine, CA 92614

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF COURT DEF

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT (DEFAULT BY CLERK PREVIOUSLY ENTERED) FILED.

DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGME

DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER CCP 585(D)) FILED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/18/2017 OF ENCANTO APARTMENT HOMES LP - DISPOSITIONED CASE.

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY COURT U

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY COURT UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED . SIGNED BY HONORABLE COMMISSIONER DAVID E. GREGORY.

DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR LOST

DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR LOST OR UNAVAILABLE ORIGINAL RENTAL AGREEMENT BY ENCANTO APARTMENT HOMES LP FILED; HONORABLE COMMISSIONER DAVID E. GREGORY.

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(SOUTHWEST)

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92586.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DET

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/18/2017 OF ENCANTO APARTMENT HOMES LP AND FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWF

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/18/2017 OF ENCANTO APARTMENT HOMES LP SERVED ON TOUREY TUCK WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/18/17 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT A

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/18/2017 OF ENCANTO APARTMENT HOMES LP AS TO TOUREY TUCK

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR R

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK -

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 07/25/17

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY ENCANTO APARTMENT HOMES LP.

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SA

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SATISFIED

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR LOST OR UNAVAILABLE ORIGINAL RENTAL AGREEMENT BY ENCANTO APARTMENT HOMES LP FILED; HONORABLE COMMISSIONER DAVID E. GREGORY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY COURT UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED . SIGNED BY HONORABLE COMMISSIONER DAVID E. GREGORY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • JUDGMENT RECEIVED AND FORWARDED TO ORIGINATING COURT - DEPARTMENT S205.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT H1 FOR JUDGMENT REVIEW. (UNLAWFUL DETAINER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT REVIEW IS SET ON 10/10/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. DJUD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/18/2017 OF ENCANTO APARTMENT HOMES LP - DISPOSITIONED CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER CCP 585(D)) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT (DEFAULT BY CLERK PREVIOUSLY ENTERED) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/18/2017 OF ENCANTO APARTMENT HOMES LP AS TO TOUREY TUCK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/18/2017 OF ENCANTO APARTMENT HOMES LP SERVED ON TOUREY TUCK WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/18/17 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 9/18/17 AT 8:00 IN CLES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/18/2017 OF ENCANTO APARTMENT HOMES LP AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92586.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT S205 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less