Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/20/2017 at 12:01:28 (UTC).

EMERALD REALTY PARTNERS VS CLARK

Case Summary

On 03/21/2017 EMERALD REALTY PARTNERS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CLARK. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0494

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Murrieta Southwest Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EMERALD REALTY PARTNERS

1704 Via Verde Dr

Rialto, CA 92377

Defendants

LARNELL CLARK

IRMA HAWTHORNE

MARIA FIGUEROA

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(SOUTHWEST)

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92571.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DET

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/21/2017 OF EMERALD REALTY PARTNERS AND FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWF

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/21/2017 OF EMERALD REALTY PARTNERS SERVED ON IRMA HAWTHORNE WITH SERVICE DATE OF 03/21/17 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWF

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/21/2017 OF EMERALD REALTY PARTNERS SERVED ON MARIA FIGUEROA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 03/21/17 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWF

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/21/2017 OF EMERALD REALTY PARTNERS SERVED ON LARNELL CLARK WITH SERVICE DATE OF 03/21/17 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK -

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 03/28/17

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR R

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT A

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/21/2017 OF EMERALD REALTY PARTNERS AS TO LARNELL CLARK, MARIA FIGUEROA, IRMA HAWTHORNE

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY EMERALD REALTY PARTNERS.

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SA

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SATISFIED

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2017
  • DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY EMERALD REALTY PARTNERS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/21/2017 OF EMERALD REALTY PARTNERS AS TO LARNELL CLARK, MARIA FIGUEROA, IRMA HAWTHORNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 03/28/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/21/2017 OF EMERALD REALTY PARTNERS SERVED ON LARNELL CLARK WITH SERVICE DATE OF 03/21/17 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/21/2017 OF EMERALD REALTY PARTNERS SERVED ON MARIA FIGUEROA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 03/21/17 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/21/2017 OF EMERALD REALTY PARTNERS SERVED ON IRMA HAWTHORNE WITH SERVICE DATE OF 03/21/17 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 5/22/17 AT 8:00 IN CLES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/21/2017 OF EMERALD REALTY PARTNERS AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92571.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT S205 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less