This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/08/2019 at 01:10:42 (UTC).

ELY VS WOODSIDE HOMES

Case Summary

On 01/12/2018 ELY filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against WOODSIDE HOMES. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1017

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DAVID & DIANA ELY

CIRIACO N & LIGAYAMERCADO

VICTOR RODRIGUEZ

MING HUANG

NICKLAUS & KENDRA METNIK

ROBERT & JAMIE MAINWARING

TRAVIS & NICHOL ROBBINS

ERIC & MELISSA GROOM

WILLIE BERNARD

MARC & SHERRY LERWICK

JOSPEH REYES

VALERIE BECKHAM

MATTHEW & REBECCA LILLIG

KERRY BLOUNT

BRIAN & TRACY JOYCE

Defendants

WOODSIDE HOMES

WOODSIDE WOLF CREEK 127 INC

WOODSIDE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA

WOODSIDE WOLF CREEK 77 INC

WOODSIDE 05SLP

164 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MILSTEIN JACKSON FAIRCHILD & WADE LLP

10250 Constellation Blvd 14Th Floor.

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Other Attorneys

WOOD SMITH HENNING& BERMAN LLP

21804 Cactus Ave #200

Riverside, CA 92518-3010

LETOFSKY-MCCLAIN

3655 Nobel Drive Suite 400

San Diego, CA 92122

LAW OFFICES OF ADRIANNE D COHEN

1551 N Tustin Ave, Ste 750

Santa Ana, CA 92705

BULLARD BROWN & BEAL LLP

234 E. Commonwealth Avenue Second Floor

Fullerton, CA 92832

KULUVA ARMIJO & GARCIA

9655 Granite Ridge Dr #450

San Diego, CA 92123

HAMMONS & BALDINO

2601 Airport Dr #105

Torrance, CA 90505

SKEBBA ISAAC & BUCHLER

One Macarthur Place Suite 650

Santa Ana, CA 92707

ANGULO MCGHEE APLC

2900 Bristol St #C-207

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

MORROW & WHITE

535 Anton Blvd Suite 1150

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

RESNICK & LOUIS

9891 Irvine Center Dr., #200

Irvine, CA 92618

NEMECEK & COLE

16255 Ventura Boulevard Suite 300

Encino, CA 91436

MOKRI VANIS & JONES LLP

4100 Newport Pl Dr Ste 840

Newport Beach, CA 92660

LETOFSKY * MCLAIN

3655 Nobel Dr Ste 400

San Diego, CA 92122

SKEBBA, ISAAC & BUECHLER

One Macarthur Place Ste 650

Santa Ana, CA 92707

HAMMONS & ASSOCIATES INC

2601 Airport Drive Suite 105

Torrance, CA 90505

 

Court Documents

ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND APPL FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT RE M&M PLUMBING INC; HONORABLE JUDGE SUNSHINE S SYKES.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF DAVID & DIANA ELY AS TO RCR COMPANIES FILED.

DECLARATION OF BRENDON DALRYMP

DECLARATION OF BRENDON DALRYMPLE IN PREPARATION FOR OSC RE SERVICE OF CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF DAVID & DIANA ELY AS TO FAIRWAY LANDSCAPE &IRRIGATIONINC FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 02/07/2019 OF WOODSIDE 05S LP AS TO PACIFIC TRIM AND SUPPLY, INC; MAILING DATE OF 04/25/19 FILED.

DECLARATION OF HENRY H KANG IN

DECLARATION OF HENRY H KANG IN RESPONSE TO COURTS OSC RE FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE FILED

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PRE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 02/07/2019 OF WOODSIDE 05S LP AS TO HOME ACCENTS INC FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 04/15/2019 OF MILGARD MANUFACTURING INC AS TO RANDY JEMIOLA; MAILING DATE OF 06/17/19 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CROSS

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 02/07/2019 OF WOODSIDE 05S LP SERVED ON PACIFIC COAST DRYWALL & PAINT INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 04/25/19 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AM

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF DAVID & DIANA ELY SERVED ON HORIZON PLUMBING INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 03/21/19 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILE

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 02/07/2019 OF WOODSIDE 05S LP BY LDI MECHANICAL INC REPRESENTED BY BULLARD BROWN & BEAL LLP FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF DAVID & DIANA ELY AS TO HARRIS FENCE CO INC; MAILING DATE OF 02/01/19 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF DAVID & DIANA ELY AS TO RCR PLUMBING AND MECHANICAL INC; MAILING DATE OF 02/05/19 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 02/07/2019 OF WOODSIDE 05S LP AS TO LEONARD ROOFING INC; MAILING DATE OF 02/25/19 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 02/07/2019 OF WOODSIDE 05S LP AS TO STEEL-T A/C INC; MAILING DATE OF 02/28/19 FILED.

AMENDMENT TO CROSS COMPLAINT F

AMENDMENT TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 02/07/2019 OF WOODSIDE 05S LP NAMING DOES 01 TO BE GATEWAY INSULATIONINC FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AM

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF DAVID & DIANA ELY SERVED ON MILGARD MANUFACTURING INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/28/19 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

DOE AMENDMENT NO 2 FILED.

DOE AMENDMENT NO 2 FILED.

310 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2020
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • HEARING RE: OSC RE FAILURE TO SERVE/FAILURE TO TAKE DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 02/07/2019 OF WOODSIDE 05S LP AS TO INNOVATIVE FRAMINGCOMPONENTS INC FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • RETURNED DOCUMENT: ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT SUBMITTED BY RND CONSTRUCTION INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF DAVID & DIANA ELY AS TO LARRY METHVIN INSTALLATIONS INC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • ESUBMIT FEE BY BUILDER SERVICES GROUP, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • CHANGE ATTORNEY ON BUILDER SERVICES GROUP, INC FROM HAMMONS & BALDINO TO HAMMONS & ASSOCIATES INC ON ALL COMPLAINTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME BY BUILDER SERVICES GROUP, INC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 02/07/2019 OF WOODSIDE 05S LP AS TO PACIFIC SHORELINE ELECTRIC INC FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER BY GOTHIC LANDSCAPINGINC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
397 More Docket Entries
  • 02/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 01/12/2018 OF DAVID & DIANA ELY SERVED ON WOODSIDE 05S LP WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/23/18 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF BAD ADDRESS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE CRAIG G. RIEMER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92592.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • COMPLEX CASE DESIGNATION FEE PAID ON COMPLAINT FILED 01/12/2018 OF DAVID & DIANA ELY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 3/13/18 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 01/12/2018 OF DAVID & DIANA ELY AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 05 - COMPLEX CASE (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING - COMPLEX CASE SET 3/13/18 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 05.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - COMPLEX CASE. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Woodside Homes Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Woodside Homes of California, Inc is a litigant