Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 11/10/2016 at 03:17:56 (UTC).

EDWARD GUILLEN VS CENTEX HOMES

Case Summary

On 06/01/2010 EDWARD GUILLEN filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against CENTEX HOMES. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0749

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2010

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Appellants

KARLEEN AIKEN

DESTINEE HUFFMAN

JOSE BEAS

BARBARA M WURTZ

ORLANDO M SALAZAR

E IBIS SALAZAR TRUSTEES OF THE SALAZAR RE

BEVERLY A KELLMAN

Eastvale, CA 92880

SENGNAM CHIN

ANNA HUANG

CARL ROWENS JR

CHARLENE ROWENS

BERTRAM L ROBINSON

Eastvale, CA 92880

TRACY HERD

ROY MARTINEZ JR

CHRISTY MARTINEZ

ROBERT BELLIS

PAUL HOURANI

JULIE HOURANI

JOSE GARCIA

UTE GARCIA

131 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF ARTHUR J. LETTENMAIER

2625 Townsgate Rd., Ste. 330

Westlake Village, CA 91361

PRENOVOST NORMANDIN BERGH & DAWE

2122 North Broadway Suite 200

Santa Ana, CA 92706-2614

Other Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF NEIL M. SUNKIN

22908 Gershwin Dr.

Woodland Hills, CA 91364

THE LA CUES LAW GROUP

3110 Chino Avenue Suite 230

Chino Hills, CA 91709

NEWMEYER & DILLIONLLP

895 Dove Street Fifth Floor

Newport Beach, CA 92660

MORROW & WHITE

535 Anton Blvd Suite 1150

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

BREMER WHYTE BROWN& O'MEARA LLP

20320 S.W. Birch Street Second Floor

Newport Beach, CA 92660

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH

650 E Hospitality Lane #600

San Bernardino, CA 92408

CLAUSEN MILLER PC

17901 Von Karman #650

Irvine, CA 92614

COURT OF APPEALS FOURTH DISTRICT

3389 12Th Street

Riverside, CA 92501

DEMLER ARMSTRONG & ROWLAND

4500 Pacific Coast Highway 4Th Floor

Long Beach, CA 90804-3298

WAIT & HUFNAGEL

250 West First St, Suite 222

Claremont, CA 91711

TYSON & MENDES LLP

5661 La Jolla Blvd

La Jolla, CA 92037

KOLETSKY MANCINI FELDMAN & MORROW

3460 Wilshire Blvd Eighth Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90010

BREMER WHYTE BROWN& OMEARA LLP

501 West Broadway Suite 1750

San Diego, CA 92101

LAW OFFICES OF ADRIENNE D COHEN

1551 N Tustin Ave #750

Santa Ana, CA 92705

TYSON & MENDES

5661 La Jolla Blvd.

La Jolla, CA 92037

NAGPAL, VIK

501 West Broadway, Suite 1750

San Diego, CA 92101

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

650 East Hospitality Lane Suite 600

San Bernardino, CA 92408

LAW OFFICE OF MICHAEL R KAISER

801 E Tahquitz Cyn Way #101

Palm Springs, CA 92262

3 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAIN

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF EDWARD GUILLEN BY CENTEX HOMES, CENTREX REAL ESTATECORPORATION, NOMAS CORP, CENTEX REAL ESTATEHOLDING LP REPRESENTED BY NEWMEYER & DILLIONLLP FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL ON THE

ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 03/22/2011 OF CENTEX HOMES AS TO DEFENDANT STERLING PLUMBING INC ADDING ATTORNEY DEMLER ARMSTRONG &ROWLAND FILED.

REPLY TO OPPOSITIONS TO MOTION

REPLY TO OPPOSITIONS TO MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER BY EDWARD GUILLEN FILED

HERMANOS GRADINGS JOINDER TO C

HERMANOS GRADINGS JOINDER TO CENTEX HOMES MOTIONS IN LIMINE

PLFFS OPPOSITION TO CENTEX MIL

PLFFS OPPOSITION TO CENTEX MIL NO. 14

DEFTS OPPOSITION AND PLFFS MIL

DEFTS OPPOSITION AND PLFFS MIL NO. 3

GOLDEN STATE CONCRETES MIL NO.

GOLDEN STATE CONCRETES MIL NO. 5

MOTION TO/FOR DETERMINATION OF

MOTION TO/FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT , BY CAPITAL DRYWALL INC FILED

CENTEX OPPOSITION TO CAPITAL D

CENTEX OPPOSITION TO CAPITAL DRYWALLS MIL TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE

ORDER FOR MTN IN LIMINE BY T M

ORDER FOR MTN IN LIMINE BY T MCGEE ELECTRICAL TO EXCLUDE IS GRA AND FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE JOHN W VINEYARD.

DEFTS MIL NO. 20: TO EXCLUDE E

DEFTS MIL NO. 20: TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE REGARDING PRE-SATURATION OF SOILS

DEFTS MIL NO. 21: TO EXCLUDE E

DEFTS MIL NO. 21: TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OFFERED IN VIOLATION OF THE PAROLE EVIDENCE RULE

SEP STATEMENT IN SUPP OF MOTIO

SEP STATEMENT IN SUPP OF MOTION TO COMPEL SPEC INTERROGS SET ONE TO NOMAS CORPORATION

MOTION TO/FOR COMPEL FURTHER R

MOTION TO/FOR COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES BY CENTEX HOMES FILED

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; ON 4TH AMENDED COMPLAINT OF EDWARD GUILLEN REMOVE ATTORNEY LA CUES LAW GROUP FOR PARTY(S) BEVERLY A KELLMAN AND REPLACE WITH ATTORNEY PRO/PER

NOTICE OF RULING RE: TRIAL SET

NOTICE OF RULING RE: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE FILED

FILED: AMENDED REQ FOR ESTIMAT

FILED: AMENDED REQ FOR ESTIMATE.

RECEIPT FOR RECORDS ON APPEAL

RECEIPT FOR RECORDS ON APPEAL FILED - AMENDED APPL DESIGNATIONS.

1,201 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2017
  • JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • TRIAL READINESS CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • HEARING RESERVED FOR: MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES - RES61495; Disposition: Calendared (Reservation Hearings)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • HEARING RESERVED FOR: MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS - RES61497; Disposition: Calendared (Reservation Hearings)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • HEARING RE: MOTION TO/FOR COMPEL FURTHER REPONSES FROM CENTEX REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS BY WEST COAST INTERIORS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • HEARING RE: MOTION TO/FOR COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES FROM CENTEX TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES BY WEST COAST INTERIORS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • HEARING RESERVED FOR: MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS - RES61375; Disposition: Calendared (Reservation Hearings)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • HEARING RE: MOTION TO/FOR COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES BY CARLOS SOTO AND JESSE OROZCO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • NOTICE OF TRANSCRIPTS FROM COURT REPORTER ANNA LEATH FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • NOTICE OF TRANSCRIPTS FROM COURT REPORTER MELISA LANE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
3,410 More Docket Entries
  • 06/29/2010
  • REMOVE FROM THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF EDWARD GUILLEN THE FOLLOWING PARTY(S) NOMAS CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2010
  • REMOVE FROM THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF EDWARD GUILLEN THE FOLLOWING PARTY(S) NOMAS CORPORATION, NOMAS CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF EDWARD GUILLEN FILED. (AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUPERIOR COURT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2010
  • NON PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET ON 7/28/10 @ 8:00 IN DEPARTMENT CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2010
  • COMPLEX CASE DESIGNATION FEE PAID ON COMPLAINT FILED 06/01/2010 OF EDWARD GUILLEN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 06/01/2010 OF EDWARD GUILLEN AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2010
  • NON PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 8/30/10 AT 8:00 IN DEPT CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2010
  • DIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 03. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Vik Nagpal