This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/11/2016 at 03:58:24 (UTC).

ED JENNINGS; ET AL VS PETSMART INC; ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/31/2008 ED JENNINGS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PETSMART INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Indio Larson Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3003

  • Filing Date:

    12/31/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Indio Larson Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ED JENNINGS

SALLIE JENNINGS

Defendants

PETSMART INC

MASTEK INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF TIMOTHY BROCK MCCLELLAN

77564 Country Club Dr #228

Palm Desert, CA 92211

Defendant Attorney

PETTIT KOHN INGRASSIA & LUTZ PC

9841 Airport Blvd Suite 1100

Los Angeles, CA 90045

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - S

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEP

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 1C FOR ALL PURPOSES.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FI

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/31/2008 OF ED JENNINGS AND FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 12/31/2008 OF ED JENNINGS SERVED ON PETSMART INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 02/24/09 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 12/31/2008 OF ED JENNINGS SERVED ON MASTEK INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 03/06/09 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 12/3

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 12/31/2008 OF ED JENNINGS BY PETSMART INC REPRESENTED BY PETTIT KOHN INGRASSIA & LUTZ PC FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF PETTIT KOHN INGRASSIA & LUTZ PC FILED

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PETSMART INC

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY E

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY ED JENNINGS, SALLIE JENNINGS FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY E

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY ED JENNINGS, SALLIE JENNINGS FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON COMPL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/31/2008 OF ED JENNINGS AS TO DEFENDANT MASTEK INC FILED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTI

STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE MEDIATION COMPLETION DATE FILED.

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR PROT

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER IS GRANTED; HONORABLE JUDGE JOHN G EVANS.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PRE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL A

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2011
  • DATE TO SET OSC RE DESTRUCTION OF FILE (DISMISSAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2010
  • HEARING RE: POST MEDIATION; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2010
  • DEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM 1C TO 2F.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2010
  • HPM CALENDARED ON 05/21/10 IN DEPT. 1C. HAS BEEN UPDATED TO 05/21/10 IN DEPT. 2F.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2010
  • HEARING RE: POST MEDIATION; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER IS GRANTED; HONORABLE JUDGE JOHN G EVANS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2009
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER FEE PAID BY PETSMART INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2009
  • HEARING RE: POST MEDIATION SET 5/21/10 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 1C

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 06/12/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PETSMART INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2009
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE (NON-APPEARANCE) HEARING; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF PETTIT KOHN INGRASSIA & LUTZ PC FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 12/31/2008 OF ED JENNINGS BY PETSMART INC REPRESENTED BY PETTIT KOHN INGRASSIA & LUTZ PC FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 12/31/2008 OF ED JENNINGS SERVED ON MASTEK INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 03/06/09 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 12/31/2008 OF ED JENNINGS SERVED ON PETSMART INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 02/24/09 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/31/2008 OF ED JENNINGS AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 1C FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mastek Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where PACIFIC COAST DISTRIBUTING INC. is a litigant