This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/28/2016 at 04:51:54 (UTC).

EARLY VS THE CITY OF MORENO VALLEY

Case Summary

On 10/21/2013 EARLY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against THE CITY OF MORENO VALLEY. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1889

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Respondents

PAUL EARLY

ANNE SCHNEIDER

ALBERT BRADY

THE CITY OF MORENOVALLEY

SUZANNE BRYANT

Defendant and Appellant

THOMAS OWINGS

Plaintiffs, Defendants and Respondents

THE CITY OF MORENOVALLEY

THOMAS OWINGS

SUZANNE BRYANT

MARCELO CO

MICHAEL GELLER

Not Classified By Court

COURT OF APPEAL FOURTH APPELLATE DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

BENNETT, GARY S.

23161 Mill Creek Dr., #340

Laguna Hills, CA 92653

LIEBERT CASSIDY WHITMORE

6033 West Century Boulevard Suite 500

Los Angeles, CA 90045

ATKINSON, ANDELSON, LOYA, RUUD& ROMO

20 Pacifica, Ste. 400

Irvine, CA 92618-3371

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

ATKINSON, ANDELSON, LOYA, RUUD& ROMO

20 Pacifica, Ste. 400

Irvine, CA 92618-3371

Not Classified By Court Attorney

COURT OF APPEALS FOURTH DISTRICT

3389 12Th Street

Riverside, CA 92501

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS FILED.

SUMMONS FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF NO

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF NOTICE OF MOTION ON PAUL EARLY, ANNE SCHNEIDER, ALBERT BRADY WITH A MAILING DATE OF 11/06/13 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED 10

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED 10/21/2013 OF PAUL EARLY BY THE CITY OF MORENOVALLEY, SUZANNE BRYANT REPRESENTED BY LIEBERT CASSIDY WHITMORE FILED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (OTHER)

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (OTHER) 6TH,7TH,8TH,9TH,10TH & 11TH CAUSES OF ACTION AS TO MICHAEL GELLER FILED.

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED 10

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED 10/21/2013 OF PAUL EARLY BY THOMAS OWINGS REPRESENTED BY MARY A SALAMONE FILED.

DECLARATION OF OF KELLIE S CHR

DECLARATION OF OF KELLIE S CHRISTIANSON IN SUPPORT OF SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT FILED

MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT FOR

MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES BY THOMAS OWINGS FILED

NOTICE OF RULING RE: DEMURRER

NOTICE OF RULING RE: DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE VIA EMAIL TO

PROOF OF SERVICE VIA EMAIL TO CO DEF CITY OF MOREN O VALLEY RE MTN TO STRIKE AND DEMURRER

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FI

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED

ORDER FOR MOTION TO STRIKE PLA

ORDER FOR MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT IS DEN AND FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE GLORIA CONNOR TRASK.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 10/21/2013 OF PAUL EARLY AS TO MARCELO CO FILED.

NOTICE OF APPEAL IN SUPERIOR C

NOTICE OF APPEAL IN SUPERIOR COURT FILED BY THOMAS OWINGS, ORDER/JUDGMENT DATE AND/OR REASON FOR APPEAL NOT SPECIFIED.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY THE CITY OF MORENOVALLEY.

CASE REASSIGNED TO JUDGE SHARO

CASE REASSIGNED TO JUDGE SHARON J. WATERS IN DEPARTMENT 10 FOR ALL FUTURE PROCEEDINGS. (RIVERSIDE)

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PRE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ON COMPLAINT FILED 10/21/2013 OF PAUL EARLY AS TO PLAINTIFF PAUL EARLY FILED.

DECLARATION OF OF GARY S BENNE

DECLARATION OF OF GARY S BENNETT IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION FILED

REMITTITUR FROM COURT OF APPEA

REMITTITUR FROM COURT OF APPEAL FILED; RULING JUDGMENT IS AFFIRMED; JUSTICE MCKINSTER, KING, CODRINGTON.

66 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • REMITTITUR FROM COURT OF APPEAL FILED; RULING JUDGMENT IS AFFIRMED; JUSTICE MCKINSTER, KING, CODRINGTON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER FOR DECLARATION FOR REQUEST FOR REFUND JURY FEES IS DEN AND FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE SHARON J. WATERS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2015
  • JURY TRIAL; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2015
  • HEARING RE: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT FILED 10/21/2013 OF PAUL EARLY BY THE CITY OF MORENOVALLEY; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • HEARING RE: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT FILED 10/21/2013 OF PAUL EARLY BY THE CITY OF MORENOVALLEY; Disposition: Continued Not Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2015
  • HEARING RESERVED FOR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT.; Disposition: Off-Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2015
  • HEARING RE: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT FILED 10/21/2013 OF PAUL EARLY BY THE CITY OF MORENOVALLEY; Disposition: Continued Not Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE RE DEF. AMENDED REPLY IN SUPPORT FILED BY THE CITY OF MORENOVALLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE RE NOTICE OF ERRATA FILED BY THE CITY OF MORENOVALLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
154 More Docket Entries
  • 11/07/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF NOTICE OF MOTION ON PAUL EARLY, ANNE SCHNEIDER, ALBERT BRADY WITH A MAILING DATE OF 11/06/13 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2013
  • COURT REPORTER FEE (UNDER ONE HOUR) PAID BY DEFENDANT MICHAEL GELLER FOR HEARING 12/11/13.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2013
  • HEARING RE: MOTION TO STRIKE SET 12/11/13 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT 02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT BY MICHAEL GELLER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92553.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2013
  • DIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 05. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2013
  • CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 02 FOR LAW AND MOTION PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less