Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 04/30/2021 at 20:30:56 (UTC).

EAGLE TRANSPORTATION SERVICES INC vs COFFMAN SPECIALTIES INC

Case Summary

On 03/03/2020 EAGLE TRANSPORTATION SERVICES INC filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against COFFMAN SPECIALTIES INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Daniel Ottolia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0973

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Not Yet Classified

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Daniel Ottolia

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EAGLE TRANSPORTATION SERVICES INC

Defendant

COFFMAN SPECIALTIES INC

9685 Via Excelencia Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92126

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE MELLOR LAW FIRM

Attorney at THE MELLOR LAW FIRM

6800 Indiana Ave Suite 220

Riverside, CA 92506

Defendant Attorney

COFFMAN SPECIALTIES INC

9685 Via Excelencia Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92126

 

Court Documents

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

03/22/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Certificate of Mailing

02/25/2021: Certificate of Mailing

Corrected Nunc Pro Tunc Case Management Statement on Complaint of EAGLE TRANSPORTATION SERVICES INC

01/12/2021: Corrected Nunc Pro Tunc Case Management Statement on Complaint of EAGLE TRANSPORTATION SERVICES INC

Notice of appearance

01/06/2021: Notice of appearance

Legacy Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing

11/02/2020: Legacy Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing

Declaration of Mark A Mellor in Opposition to OSC Re Sanctions for Failure to File Default Judgment filed

10/20/2020: Declaration of Mark A Mellor in Opposition to OSC Re Sanctions for Failure to File Default Judgment filed

Answer to Complaint of EAGLE TRANSPORTATION SERVICES INC by COFFMAN SPECIALTIES INC represented by COFFMAN SPECIALTIES INC filed. (Over $25,000.00)

10/09/2020: Answer to Complaint of EAGLE TRANSPORTATION SERVICES INC by COFFMAN SPECIALTIES INC represented by COFFMAN SPECIALTIES INC filed. (Over $25,000.00)

System Generated Notice re: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing.

07/29/2020: System Generated Notice re: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing.

System Generated Notice re: NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

03/03/2020: System Generated Notice re: NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

03/03/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92509.

03/03/2020: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92509.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2021
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Daniel Ottolia; Location/Courtroom: Department 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Daniel Ottolia; Location/Courtroom: Department 4; Disposition: Continued Hearing Not Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • HearingType: Court on its Own Motion; Judicial Officer: Daniel Ottolia; Location/Courtroom: Department 4; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference Hearing; Judicial Officer: Daniel Ottolia; Location/Courtroom: Department 4; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • HearingType: Court on its Own Motion; Judicial Officer: Daniel Ottolia; Location/Courtroom: Department 4; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Case Management Statement untimely pursuant to CRC 3.725 on Complaint of EAGLE TRANSPORTATION SERVICES INC; Filed By: COFFMAN SPECIALTIES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Case Management Statement filed by EAGLE TRANSPORTATION SERVICES INC; Filed By: EAGLE TRANSPORTATION SERVICES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service (Sub-Served and Mailed) on Complaint of EAGLE TRANSPORTATION SERVICES INC as to COFFMAN SPECIALTIES INC; mailing date of 03/10/20 filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92509.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint of EAGLE TRANSPORTATION SERVICES INC and filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Riverside)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketFilings: Complaint of EAGLE TRANSPORTATION SERVICES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 02/28/2020; Fine Description: Check #9731 Receipt No.: CV200303-0398-CK.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EAGLE TRANSPORTATION SERVICE, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where COFFMAN SPECIALTIES, INC . is a litigant