Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 08/05/2016 at 17:47:30 (UTC).

DUKES FOR AKER VS GOODNIGHT

Case Summary

On 06/16/2015 DUKES FOR AKER filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GOODNIGHT. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Banning Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0210

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Banning Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DUKES FOR AKER LLC

Defendant

NOEL GOODNIGHT

Other

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF WILLIAM E WINDHAM

1001 E Morton Place #C

Hemet, CA 92543

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (BANNING)

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92223.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

CASE REASSIGNED TO HEARING OFF

CASE REASSIGNED TO HEARING OFFICER JUDITH M FOULADI IN DEPARTMENT B201 FOR ALL FUTURE PROCEEDINGS. (RIVERSIDE)

170.6 FILED BY DUKES FOR AKER

170.6 FILED BY DUKES FOR AKER LLC AGAINST JUDGE SAMUEL DIAZ GRANTED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, U

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/16/2015 OF DUKES FOR AKER LLC AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO NOEL GOODNIGHT WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/20/15 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/16/2015 OF DUKES FOR AKER LLC AS TO NOEL GOODNIGHT FILED.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR R

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT A

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/16/2015 OF DUKES FOR AKER LLC AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/16/2015 OF DUKES FOR AKER LLC AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 06/20/15 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK -

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 07/01/15

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY DUKES FOR AKER LLC.

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT O

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; SATISFIED FILED.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2015
  • DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; SATISFIED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY DUKES FOR AKER LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 07/01/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/16/2015 OF DUKES FOR AKER LLC AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 06/20/15 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/16/2015 OF DUKES FOR AKER LLC AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/16/2015 OF DUKES FOR AKER LLC AS TO NOEL GOODNIGHT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/16/2015 OF DUKES FOR AKER LLC AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO NOEL GOODNIGHT WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/20/15 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • 170.6 FILED BY DUKES FOR AKER LLC AGAINST JUDGE SAMUEL DIAZ GRANTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE REASSIGNED TO HEARING OFFICER JUDITH M FOULADI IN DEPARTMENT B201 FOR ALL FUTURE PROCEEDINGS. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2015
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 8/17/15 AT 8:30 IN BCLRK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92223.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2015
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (BANNING)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2015
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT B201 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (BANNING)

    Read MoreRead Less