This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 05/17/2019 at 05:55:19 (UTC).

DUFRESNE VS AEROHOFF INSPECTION SERVICES INC

Case Summary

On 09/30/2015 DUFRESNE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against AEROHOFF INSPECTION SERVICES INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0414

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Appellants, Cross Defendants and Intervenor Plaintiffs

NANCY MERRIS DUFRESNE

CAROLE J. DUFRESNEDE LA FUENTE

STEVEN EDWARD DUFRESNE

GRANT WESLEY DUFRESNE

SUZANNE M PENIR

STEPHANIE J TAYLOR

SHARON MORGAN

ALEXANDER MORGAN

HARRISON L MORGAN

GUIDEONE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Interested Parties, Intervenor Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

CATLIN INSURANCE COMPANY INC

GUIDEONE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Plaintiffs, Appellants and Cross Defendants

NANCY MERRIS DUFRESNE

CAROLE J. DUFRESNEDE LA FUENTE

STEVEN EDWARD DUFRESNE

GRANT WESLEY DUFRESNE

SUZANNE M PENIR

STEPHANIE J TAYLOR

SHARON MORGAN

ALEXANDER MORGAN

HARRISON L MORGAN

Defendants, Respondents, Cross Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Intervenor Defendants

AIRCRAFTSMAN INC

700 Merrill Avenue Box 100 Hanger B-350

Chino, CA 91710

AVIATION MAINTENANCE GROUP

BUCKLEY AIRCRAFT MAINTENANCE

CENTURY AIRCRAFT PAINTING

CESSNA AIRCRAFT COMPANY

GRYPHON AIRCRAFT SERVICES LLC

SAN DIEGO AIRMOTIVE

AEROHOFF INSPECTION SERVICES INC

GUIDEONE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Plaintiffs, Appellants, Cross Defendants and Intervenor Defendants

NANCY MERRIS DUFRESNE

STEVEN EDWARD DUFRESNE

GRANT WESLEY DUFRESNE

SUZANNE M PENIR

STEPHANIE J TAYLOR

SHARON MORGAN

ALEXANDER MORGAN

HARRISON L MORGAN

AIRCRAFTSMAN INC

700 Merrill Avenue Box 100 Hanger B-350

Chino, CA 91710

AVIATION MAINTENANCE GROUP

BUCKLEY AIRCRAFT MAINTENANCE

CENTURY AIRCRAFT PAINTING

CESSNA AIRCRAFT COMPANY

GRYPHON AIRCRAFT SERVICES LLC

SAN DIEGO AIRMOTIVE

AEROHOFF INSPECTION SERVICES INC

GUIDEONE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

EDWARD DUFRESNE

Interested Party and Intervenor Plaintiff

CATLIN INSURANCE COMPANY INC

58 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Cross Defendant, Respondent and Intervenor Plaintiff Attorneys

NELSON & FRAENKEL LLP

601 S Figueroa St Ste 2050

Los Angeles, CA 90017

BAILEY & PARTNERS

11400 West Olympic Blvd Suite 200

Los Angeles, CA 90064

BURNHAM BROWN

Po Box 119

Oakland, CA 94604

SELMAN BREITMAN LLP

11766 Wilshire Boulevard Sixth Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025-6538

Plaintiff, Appellant and Cross Defendant Attorney

BAILEY & PARTNERS

11400 West Olympic Blvd Suite 200

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Cross Defendant, Defendant, Respondent, Intervenor Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

MICHAELIS MONTANARI & JOHNSON

4333 Park Terrace Drive Suite 110

Westlake Village, CA 91361

LAW OFFICES OF DOUG GRIFFITH

155 N Lake Ave #800

Pasadena, CA 91101

LAW OFFICES OF ANDREW YURCHO

18399 Los Caranarios St.

Fountain Valley, CA 92807

SILVERMAN, PHILLIP E.

620 South Euclid Street

Anaheim, CA 92802

WORTHE HANSON WORTHE

1851 East First Street Ninth Floor

Santa Ana, CA 92705

GORDON & REES LLP

633 West Fifth St 52Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Plaintiff, Cross Defendant, Respondent, Intervenor Plaintiff and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

BURNHAM BROWN

Po Box 119

Oakland, CA 94604

MICHAELIS MONTANARI & JOHNSON

4333 Park Terrace Drive Suite 110

Westlake Village, CA 91361

LAW OFFICES OF DOUG GRIFFITH

155 N Lake Ave #800

Pasadena, CA 91101

SILVERMAN, PHILLIP E.

620 South Euclid Street

Anaheim, CA 92802

WORTHE HANSON WORTHE

1851 East First Street Ninth Floor

Santa Ana, CA 92705

GORDON & REES LLP

633 West Fifth St 52Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

NELSON & FRAENKEL LLP

601 S Figueroa St Ste 2050

Los Angeles, CA 90017

BAILEY & PARTNERS

11400 West Olympic Blvd Suite 200

Los Angeles, CA 90064

KRIENDLER & KRIENDLER LLP

750 Third Ave 32Nd Floor

New York, NY 10017

LAW OFFICES OF ANDREW YURCHO

18399 Los Caranarios St.

Fountain Valley, CA 92807

Interested Party and Intervenor Plaintiff Attorney

SELMAN BREITMAN LLP

11766 Wilshire Boulevard Sixth Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025-6538

Other Attorneys

SCHANZ LAW CORPORATION

120 Vantis, Suite 450

Aliso Viejo, CA 92656

COURT OF APPEALS FOURTH DISTRICT

3389 12Th Street

Riverside, CA 92501

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FO

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR COUNSEL REPRESENTING NANCY MERRIS DUFRESNE, CAROLE J. DUFRESNEDE LA FUENTE, STEVEN EDWARD DUFRESNE, GRANT WESLEY DUFRESNE, SUZANNE M PENIR, STEPHANIE J TAYLOR, SHARON MORGAN, ALEXANDER MORGAN. ADDRESS CHANGED FOR: NELSON & FRAENKEL LLP FILED.

OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER BY GRYP

OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER BY GRYPHON AIRCRAFT SERVICES LLC, GLEN KRATZ FILED

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DUFRESNE INC, ESTATE OF EDWARD DUFRESNE DECEASED, ESTATE OF MITCHELLMORGAN

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FI

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY AVIATION MAINTENANCE GROUP.

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF PARTIAL S

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF PARTIAL SETTLEMENT FILED

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PRE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 09/30/2015 OF NANCY DUFRESNE AS TO AVIATION MAINTENANCE GROUP FILED

REPLY TO IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOT

REPLY TO IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR DETERMINATION BY CESSNA AIRCRAFT COMPANY FILED

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NO

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING.

INTERVENOR OBJECTIONS AND MTN

INTERVENOR OBJECTIONS AND MTN TO STRIKE IN SUPPORT OF ITS OPPO TO PLTFS MTN

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF MP

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF MPA AND OBJECTIONS TO MTN ON SEE LIST WITH A MAILING DATE OF 04/25/18 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

DECLARATION OF STEPHEN RANDALL

DECLARATION OF STEPHEN RANDALL IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE FILED

REQUEST FOR ESTIMATE FILED. RE

REQUEST FOR ESTIMATE FILED. REPORTER VANESSA LIZARRAGA-FELIX, ESTIMATE FOR APPELLANT $45.00, ESTIMATE FOR RESPONDENT $9.00. ESTIMATE FOR CD $9.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF DEMURRER S

PROOF OF SERVICE OF DEMURRER SERVED ON ALL INTERESTED PARTIES SERVED 09/19/18 FILED (NON-COMPLAINT)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 09/30/2015 OF NANCY DUFRESNE SERVED ON CENTURY AIRCRAFT PAINTING WITH SERVICE DATE OF 10/07/15 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILE

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 12/02/2015 OF AIRCRAFTSMAN INC BY BUCKLEY AIRCRAFT MAINTENANCE REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICES OF DOUGGRIFFITH FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

170.6 FILED BY GRYPHON AIRCRAF

170.6 FILED BY GRYPHON AIRCRAFT SERVICES LLC, SAN DIEGO AIRMOTIVE, GLEN KRATZ AGAINST JUDGE ANGEL M. BERMUDEZ GRANTED.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL ON TH

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 12/14/2015 OF GRYPHON AIRCRAFT SERVICES LLC SERVED ON AVIATION MAINTENANCE GROUP FILED; DATE OF MAILING 02/19/16

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY AVIATION MAINTENANCE GROUP

274 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2019
  • HEARING RESERVED FOR: VACATE TRIAL DATE AND STAY ACTION - RES86837; Disposition: Calendared (Reservation Hearings)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • HEARING RE: MOTION TO/FOR CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE STAY THE CASE BY NANCY MERRIS DUFRESNE; Disposition: Continued Not Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • JURY TRIAL; Disposition: Continued Not Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • HEARING RE: MOTION TO/FOR CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE STAY THE CASE BY NANCY MERRIS DUFRESNE; Disposition: Continued Not Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • JURY TRIAL; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • HEARING RE: MOTION TO/FOR CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE STAY THE CASE BY NANCY MERRIS DUFRESNE; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF STIPULATION AND ORDER SERVED ON GRYPHON AIRCRAFT SERVICES, GLEN KRATZ, GUIDEONE SERVED 03/07/19 FILED (NON-COMPLAINT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER VACATING TRIAL DATE AND PLACING MATTER ON CIVIL INACTIVE STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • POS TIMELY/WAIVED - PROOF OF SERVICE ON MOTION TO/FOR CONTINUE TRIAL ON CALENDAR 03/08/19 IS TIMELY/WAIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER FEE PAID BY NANCY MERRIS DUFRESNE

    Read MoreRead Less
609 More Docket Entries
  • 10/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 09/30/2015 OF NANCY DUFRESNE SERVED ON GRYPHON AIRCRAFT SERVICES LLC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 10/10/15 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 09/30/2015 OF NANCY DUFRESNE SERVED ON CENTURY AIRCRAFT PAINTING WITH SERVICE DATE OF 10/07/15 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 09/30/2015 OF NANCY DUFRESNE AS TO AVIATION MAINTENANCE GROUP; MAILING DATE OF 10/07/15 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RE-ASSIGNMENT TO HONORABLE JUDGE JOHN D. MOLLOY IN DEPARTMENT 03 FOR ALL PURPOSES INCLUDING TRIAL. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • CASE REASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN D. MOLLOY IN DEPARTMENT 03 FOR ALL FUTURE PROCEEDINGS. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • 170.6 FILED BY NANCY MERRIS DUFRESNE, CAROLE J. DUFRESNEDE LA FUENTE, STEVEN EDWARD DUFRESNE, GRANT WESLEY DUFRESNE, SUZANNE M PENIR, STEPHANIE J TAYLOR, SHARON MORGAN AGAINST JUDGE RAQUEL A MARQUEZ GRANTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92562.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT S303. (SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less