This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/29/2016 at 08:46:47 (UTC).

DOWNER VS DAVIDS

Case Summary

On 01/29/2014 DOWNER filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DAVIDS. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Temecula Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0240

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Temecula Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ESTHER A DOWNER TRUSTEE FOR THE EDWARD H DO

Defendant

LOUISE DAVIDS

Other

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WINDHAM, WILLIAM E

211 N State St Ste 211

Hemet, CA 92543

LAW OFFICES OF WILLIAM E WINDHAM

1001 E Morton Place #C

Hemet, CA 92543

 

Court Documents

LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINE

LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92563.

SUMMONS FILED.

SUMMONS FILED.

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 01/29/2014 OF ESTHER A DOWNER TRUSTEE FOR THEEDWARD H DO AS TO LOUISE DAVIDS FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, U

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 01/29/2014 OF ESTHER A DOWNER TRUSTEE FOR THEEDWARD H DO AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO LOUISE DAVIDS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/30/14 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 01/29/2014 OF ESTHER A DOWNER TRUSTEE FOR THEEDWARD H DO AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 01/30/14 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK -

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 02/11/14

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR R

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT A

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 01/29/2014 OF ESTHER A DOWNER TRUSTEE FOR THEEDWARD H DO AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY ESTHER A DOWNER TRUSTEE FOR THEEDWARD H DO.

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT O

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; SATISFIED FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2014
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL ENTIRE CASE - TEMECULA; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; SATISFIED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY ESTHER A DOWNER TRUSTEE FOR THEEDWARD H DO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 01/29/2014 OF ESTHER A DOWNER TRUSTEE FOR THEEDWARD H DO AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 02/11/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 01/29/2014 OF ESTHER A DOWNER TRUSTEE FOR THEEDWARD H DO AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 01/30/14 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 01/29/2014 OF ESTHER A DOWNER TRUSTEE FOR THEEDWARD H DO AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO LOUISE DAVIDS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/30/14 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 01/29/2014 OF ESTHER A DOWNER TRUSTEE FOR THEEDWARD H DO AS TO LOUISE DAVIDS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2014
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92563.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2014
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE SET 4/04/14 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. T1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2014
  • PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION ATTACHED TO THE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2014
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT T1 (UNLAWFUL DETAINER (TEMECULA)

    Read MoreRead Less