This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/23/2018 at 10:18:20 (UTC).

DIVERSIFIED ACCEPTANCE CORP VS BROOKS

Case Summary

On 07/13/2005 DIVERSIFIED ACCEPTANCE CORP filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BROOKS. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Indio Larson Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2076

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

DIVERSIFIED ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION

BROOKS M LONDON

BONNIE BONFANTI

Defendants and Plaintiffs

LONDON BROOKS

BROOKS M LONDON

RONALD MILLER A PROFESSIONAL DENTAL CORP

RONALD W MILLER DDS

RONALD W MILLER D.D.S. INC

Cross Plaintiff, Plaintiff and Defendant

BROOKS M LONDON

Cross Defendants and Defendants

RONALD MILLER

RONALD W MILLER DDS

Not Classified By Court

INC057459 CONSOLIDATED CASE NUMBER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF LLOYD DOUGLAS DIX

216 S. Louise St 2Nd Floor

Glendale, CA 91205

BAGNASCHI, CHRISTOPHER J.

500 N Brand Blvd Suite 1660

Glendale, CA 91203

NEAL HAUSHALTER & RAY LLP

200 Sandpointe Avenue Suite 750

Santa Ana, CA 92707-5777

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

NEAL HAUSHALTER & RAY LLP

200 Sandpointe Avenue Suite 750

Santa Ana, CA 92707-5777

Not Classified By Court Attorney

CONSOLIDATED CASE NUMBER

 

Court Documents

LIMITED CIVIL - GENERAL CIVIL

LIMITED CIVIL - GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT OVER 10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED.

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEP

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 2J FOR ALL PURPOSES.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON 1ST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT OF BROOKS LONDON AS TO RONALD MILLER; MAILING DATE OF 11/29/05 FILED.

DECLARATION OF ELLEN JACKSON I

DECLARATION OF ELLEN JACKSON IN RESPONSE TO OSC FILED

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED CROSS CO

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT OF BROOKS LONDON BY RONALD W MILLER DDS REPRESENTED BY NEAL HAUSHALTER & RAY LLP FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

NOTICE OF APPOINTMENT OF ARBIT

NOTICE OF APPOINTMENT OF ARBITRATOR.

DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER J B

DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER J BAGNASCHI FILED

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF THE LAW OFFICES OF CHRISTOPHER J BAGNASCHI FILED (ADDRESS PREVIOUSLY CHANGED ON SYSTEM)

MOTION TO TAX COSTS BY BROOKS

MOTION TO TAX COSTS BY BROOKS M LONDON FILED

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY RONALD W MILLER DDS

MOTION TO/FOR COMPEL FURTHER R

MOTION TO/FOR COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGS SET NO 3 BY RONALD W MILLER DDS FILED

NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY

NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE 09/18/06 BY RONALD W MILLER DDS, RONALD MILLER A PROFESSIONAL DENTAL CORP, RONALD W MILLER D.D.S. INC FILED.

NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY

NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE BY RONALD W MILLER DDS, RONALD MILLER A PROFESSIONAL DENTAL CORP, RONALD W MILLER D.D.S. INC FILED.

NOTICE TO CONSOLIDATE BY CLERK

NOTICE TO CONSOLIDATE BY CLERK.

OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO TAX CO

OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO TAX COSTS /MPAS/DECL BY RONALD W MILLIER D.D.S/RONALD MILLER/RONALD MILLER FILED

NOTICE OF MOTION TO TAX OFF CA

NOTICE OF MOTION TO TAX OFF CALENDAR BY BROOKS M LONDON FILED.

NOTICE TO VACATE HRG DATE RE N

NOTICE TO VACATE HRG DATE RE NTC OF MTN AND MTN TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIE BY RONALD W MILLER DDS FILED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PRE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2007
  • JURY TRIAL; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2007
  • DATE TO SET OSC RE DESTRUCTION OF FILE (DISMISSAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2007
  • MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2007
  • DATE TO SET OSC RE DESTRUCTION OF FILE (DISMISSAL); Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2006
  • HEARING RE: MOTION TO/FOR COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGS SET NO 3 BY RONALD W MILLER DDS; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2006
  • HEARING RE: MOTION TO TAX COSTS BY BROOKS M LONDON; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2006
  • HMTC HEARING SET FOR 10/04/06 AT 08:30 IS VACATED -FOR THE REASON: NOTICE FROM MOVING PARTY REQ HRG VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2006
  • HEARING RE: MOTION TO/FOR COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGS SET NO 3 BY RONALD W MILLER DDS; Disposition: Advanced

    Read MoreRead Less
79 More Docket Entries
  • 09/26/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT OF BROOKS M LONDON REPRESENTED BY CHRISTOPHER J. BAGNASCHI FILED (LIMITED CIVIL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 07/13/2005 OF DIVERSIFIED ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION BY BROOKS M LONDON REPRESENTED BY CHRISTOPHER J. BAGNASCHI FILED. (OVER $10,000)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2005
  • BROOKS M LONDON ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS LONDON BROOKS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2005
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE (NON-APPEARANCE) HEARING; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 07/13/2005 OF DIVERSIFIED ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION AS TO LONDON BROOKS; MAILING DATE OF 08/19/05 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • ORIGNIAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 07/13/2005 OF DIVERSIFIED ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2005
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 07/13/2005 OF DIVERSIFIED ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 2J FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • LIMITED CIVIL - GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT OVER 10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DIVERSIFIED ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION DBA M. LEONARD & ASSOCIATES is a litigant