This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 04/13/2022 at 13:39:42 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS STOVER

Case Summary

On 04/04/2011 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against STOVER. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Banning Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0459

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK ISSUER OF THE DISCOVER CARD

Defendant

MICHAEL W STOVER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BISHOP WHITE MARSHALL & WEIBELL PS

Attorney at BISHOP WHITE MARSHALL & WEIBELL PS

700 Ygnacio Valley Rd Ste 360

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

 

Court Documents

Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collection over $10,000 and less than $25,000 CRC 3.740 fiiled.

04/04/2011: Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collection over $10,000 and less than $25,000 CRC 3.740 fiiled.

Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Banning) of DISCOVER BANK ISSUER OF THE DISCOVER CARD and filed.

04/04/2011: Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Banning) of DISCOVER BANK ISSUER OF THE DISCOVER CARD and filed.

Certificate of Counsel filed.

04/04/2011: Certificate of Counsel filed.

Proof of Service on the Complaint (Collection - Banning) of DISCOVER BANK ISSUER OF THE DISCOVER CARD served on MICHAEL W STOVER with service date of 04/06/11 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint (Collection - Banning) of DISCOVER BANK ISSUER OF THE

04/12/2011: Proof of Service on the Complaint (Collection - Banning) of DISCOVER BANK ISSUER OF THE DISCOVER CARD served on MICHAEL W STOVER with service date of 04/06/11 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint (Collection - Banning) of DISCOVER BANK ISSUER OF THE DISCOVER CARD

Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment on the Complaint (Collection - Banning) of DISCOVER BANK ISSUER OF THE DISCOVER CARD as to MICHAEL W STOVER filed.

05/12/2011: Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment on the Complaint (Collection - Banning) of DISCOVER BANK ISSUER OF THE DISCOVER CARD as to MICHAEL W STOVER filed.

Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes on the Complaint (Collection - Banning) of DISCOVER BANK ISSUER OF THE DISCOVER CARD filed.

05/12/2011: Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes on the Complaint (Collection - Banning) of DISCOVER BANK ISSUER OF THE DISCOVER CARD filed.

Judgment by Default by Clerk filed 05/12/11

05/12/2011: Judgment by Default by Clerk filed 05/12/11

Legacy Minute Order: Hearing re: Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be issued against Plaintiff for Failure to file Default Judgment pursuant to CRC 3.740 (Banning).

04/04/2012: Legacy Minute Order: Hearing re: Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be issued against Plaintiff for Failure to file Default Judgment pursuant to CRC 3.740 (Banning).

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2012
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be issued against Plaintiff for Failure to file Default Judgment pursuant to CRC 3.740 (Banning).; Location/Courtroom: Department B1; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Legacy Minute Order: Hearing re: Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be issued against Plaintiff for Failure to file Default Judgment pursuant to CRC 3.740 (Banning).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2011
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Issuing writ for enforcement of order of judgment, writ of execution; abstract of judgment; certificate of satisfaction of judgment; certifying copy of paper, record, or proceeding on file; taking affidavit; etc. (GC 70626A1-8); Amount: $25.00; Paid: $25.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/05/2011; Fine Description: Check #286715 Receipt No.: CV110805-0531-CK.1; Paid: $25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2011
  • JudgementStatus: Entered; Type: Money; Applies to: Complaint (Collection - Banning) of DISCOVER BANK ISSUER OF THE DISCOVER CARD; For/Against: Against - MICHAEL W STOVER; Details; Principal: $11,288.76; Costs: $474.50; Accrued Interest: $0.00; Attorney Fees: $1,603.87; Subtotal Judgment: $13,367.13; Total: $13,367.13

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Judgment by Default by Clerk filed 05/12/11

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes on the Complaint (Collection - Banning) of DISCOVER BANK ISSUER OF THE DISCOVER CARD filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment on the Complaint (Collection - Banning) of DISCOVER BANK ISSUER OF THE DISCOVER CARD as to MICHAEL W STOVER filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on the Complaint (Collection - Banning) of DISCOVER BANK ISSUER OF THE DISCOVER CARD served on MICHAEL W STOVER with service date of 04/06/11 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint (Collection - Banning) of DISCOVER BANK ISSUER OF THE DISCOVER CARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2011
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited complaint or other first paper amount over $10,000 up to $25,000 (GC70613A); Amount: $395.00; Paid: $395.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 04/04/2011; Fine Description: Check #265783 Receipt No.: CV110404-0201-CK.1; Paid: $395.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Banning) of DISCOVER BANK ISSUER OF THE DISCOVER CARD and filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collection over $10,000 and less than $25,000 CRC 3.740 fiiled.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2011
  • DocketFilings: Complaint (Collection - Banning) of DISCOVER BANK ISSUER OF THE DISCOVER CARD; Disposition: Complete 05/12/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant