This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 11/01/2022 at 15:46:34 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS STEIN

Case Summary

On 10/01/2013 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against STEIN. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Banning Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1058

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendants

JIM O STEIN

OLIVIA D STEIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SUTTELL HAMMER & WHITE APC

Attorney at SUTTELL HAMMER & WHITE APC

P.O. Box C-90006

Bellevue, WA 98009

 

Court Documents

Legacy Minute Order: Hearing re: Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be issued against Plaintiff for Failure to file Default Judgment pursuant to CRC 3.740 (Banning).

10/01/2014: Legacy Minute Order: Hearing re: Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be issued against Plaintiff for Failure to file Default Judgment pursuant to CRC 3.740 (Banning).

Legacy Minute Order: Hearing re: Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be issued against Plaintiff for Failure to file Default Judgment pursuant to CRC 3.740 (Banning).

12/03/2014: Legacy Minute Order: Hearing re: Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be issued against Plaintiff for Failure to file Default Judgment pursuant to CRC 3.740 (Banning).

Legacy Minute Order: Hearing re: Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be issued against Plaintiff for Failure to file Default Judgment pursuant to CRC 3.740 (Banning).

12/03/2014: Legacy Minute Order: Hearing re: Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be issued against Plaintiff for Failure to file Default Judgment pursuant to CRC 3.740 (Banning).

Legacy Minute Order: Hearing on OSC Re: Dismissal After Settlement Pursuant to Rule 3.1385(b).

01/07/2015: Legacy Minute Order: Hearing on OSC Re: Dismissal After Settlement Pursuant to Rule 3.1385(b).

Legacy Minute Order: Hearing on OSC Re: Dismissal After Settlement Pursuant to Rule 3.1385(b).

02/10/2015: Legacy Minute Order: Hearing on OSC Re: Dismissal After Settlement Pursuant to Rule 3.1385(b).

Legacy Minute Order: Hearing on OSC Re: Dismissal After Settlement Pursuant to Rule 3.1385(b).

03/05/2015: Legacy Minute Order: Hearing on OSC Re: Dismissal After Settlement Pursuant to Rule 3.1385(b).

Notice OF ATTORNEY FIRM AND ADDRESS CHANGE by DISCOVER BANK filed.

02/25/2015: Notice OF ATTORNEY FIRM AND ADDRESS CHANGE by DISCOVER BANK filed.

Notice of Reassignment of Department to Department 11. (Commissioner)

10/23/2014: Notice of Reassignment of Department to Department 11. (Commissioner)

Substitution of Attorney Filed; On Complaint (Collection - Banning) of DISCOVER BANK remove Attorney BISHOP WHITE MARSHALL & WEIBELL PS for Party(s) DISCOVER BANK and replace with Attorney KRISTA L WHITE & ASSOCIATES

09/15/2014: Substitution of Attorney Filed; On Complaint (Collection - Banning) of DISCOVER BANK remove Attorney BISHOP WHITE MARSHALL & WEIBELL PS for Party(s) DISCOVER BANK and replace with Attorney KRISTA L WHITE & ASSOCIATES

Proof of Service on the Complaint (Collection - Banning) of DISCOVER BANK served on OLIVIA D STEIN with service date of 10/09/13 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint (Collection - Banning) of DISCOVER BANK

10/16/2013: Proof of Service on the Complaint (Collection - Banning) of DISCOVER BANK served on OLIVIA D STEIN with service date of 10/09/13 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint (Collection - Banning) of DISCOVER BANK

Proof of Service on the Complaint (Collection - Banning) of DISCOVER BANK served on JIM O STEIN with service date of 10/04/13 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint (Collection - Banning) of DISCOVER BANK

10/15/2013: Proof of Service on the Complaint (Collection - Banning) of DISCOVER BANK served on JIM O STEIN with service date of 10/04/13 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint (Collection - Banning) of DISCOVER BANK

System Generated Notice re: OF ASSIGNMENT TO DEPT.

10/01/2013: System Generated Notice re: OF ASSIGNMENT TO DEPT.

System Generated Notice re: OF OSC.

10/01/2013: System Generated Notice re: OF OSC.

Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92320.

10/01/2013: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92320.

Summons Issued and Filed.

10/01/2013: Summons Issued and Filed.

Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collection under $10,000 CRC 3.740 filed.

10/01/2013: Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collection under $10,000 CRC 3.740 filed.

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2015
  • HearingType: Hearing on OSC Re: Dismissal After Settlement Pursuant to Rule 3.1385(b).; Location/Courtroom: Department 11; Disposition: Dismissed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Legacy Minute Order: Hearing on OSC Re: Dismissal After Settlement Pursuant to Rule 3.1385(b).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice OF ATTORNEY FIRM AND ADDRESS CHANGE by DISCOVER BANK filed.; Filed By: DISCOVER BANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2015
  • HearingType: Hearing on OSC Re: Dismissal After Settlement Pursuant to Rule 3.1385(b).; Location/Courtroom: Department 11; Disposition: Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Legacy Minute Order: Hearing on OSC Re: Dismissal After Settlement Pursuant to Rule 3.1385(b).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2015
  • HearingType: Hearing on OSC Re: Dismissal After Settlement Pursuant to Rule 3.1385(b).; Location/Courtroom: Department 11; Disposition: Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Legacy Minute Order: Hearing on OSC Re: Dismissal After Settlement Pursuant to Rule 3.1385(b).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2014
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be issued against Plaintiff for Failure to file Default Judgment pursuant to CRC 3.740 (Banning).; Location/Courtroom: Department B1; Disposition: Continued - Not Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2014
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be issued against Plaintiff for Failure to file Default Judgment pursuant to CRC 3.740 (Banning).; Location/Courtroom: Department 11; Disposition: Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Legacy Minute Order: Hearing re: Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be issued against Plaintiff for Failure to file Default Judgment pursuant to CRC 3.740 (Banning).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Substitution of Attorney Filed; On Complaint (Collection - Banning) of DISCOVER BANK remove Attorney BISHOP WHITE MARSHALL & WEIBELL PS for Party(s) DISCOVER BANK and replace with Attorney KRISTA L WHITE & ASSOCIATES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on the Complaint (Collection - Banning) of DISCOVER BANK served on OLIVIA D STEIN with service date of 10/09/13 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint (Collection - Banning) of DISCOVER BANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on the Complaint (Collection - Banning) of DISCOVER BANK served on JIM O STEIN with service date of 10/04/13 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint (Collection - Banning) of DISCOVER BANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2013
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited complaint or other first paper amount up to $10,000 (GC70613B); Amount: $255.00; Paid: $255.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/01/2013; Fine Description: Check #368299 Receipt No.: CV131001-0226-CK.1; Paid: $255.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: OF ASSIGNMENT TO DEPT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: OF OSC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92320.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collection under $10,000 CRC 3.740 filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2013
  • DocketFilings: Complaint (Collection - Banning) of DISCOVER BANK; Disposition: Dismissal No ADR 03/05/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant