This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 06/11/2018 at 19:42:16 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS. GRAY

Case Summary

On 06/27/2002 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GRAY. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Corona Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7549

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

NATHAN GRAY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE MOORE LAW GROUP

3710 S Susan Street Ste 210

Santa Ana, CA 92799

 

Court Documents

LIMITED CIVIL - GENERAL CIVIL

LIMITED CIVIL - GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT UNDER $10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED.

CERTIFIED COPY(S) MADE.

CERTIFIED COPY(S) MADE.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 06/27/2002 OF DISCOVER BANK AS TO NATHAN GRAY; MAILING DATE OF 08/02/02 FILED.

ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 06/27/2002 OF DISCOVER BANK RETURNED AND FILED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 06/27/2002 OF DISCOVER BANK AS TO NATHAN GRAY FILED.

DECLARATION FOR ATTORNEY FEES

DECLARATION FOR ATTORNEY FEES PURSUANT TO CIVIL CODE 1717.5 FILED

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF CLERK DEF

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF CLERK DEFAULT JUDGMENT (DEFAULT ONLY PREVIOUSLY ENTERED) FILED.

DECLARATION OF OF ANGELA C DAW

DECLARATION OF OF ANGELA C DAWSON IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED FILED

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 06/27/2002 OF DISCOVER BANK FILED.

ORDER GRANTING ACCEPTING COPIE

ORDER GRANTING ACCEPTING COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS; HONORABLE JUDGE E. MICHAEL KAISER.

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK F

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK FILED 12/27/02

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; ON COMPLAINT FILED 06/27/2002 OF DISCOVER BANK REMOVE ATTORNEY BIDNA & KEYS FOR PARTY(S) DISCOVER BANK AND REPLACE WITH ATTORNEY THE MOORE LAW GROUP

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00.

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00.

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED; SA

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED; SAN DIEGO COUNTY

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED. TOTAL RENEWED JUDGMENT AMOUNT $9,130.10. ORIGINAL JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 12/27/02.

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00.

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ISSUED AND FILED.

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF EXECUTION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY UNSATISFIED FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2013
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED; RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2013
  • Docket--AND ACCRUED INTEREST OF $300.00 AND COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT IN THE SUM OF $0.00 FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; UNSATISFIED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF NTC OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ON NATHAN THOMAS GRAY WITH A MAILING DATE OF 12/31/12 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ISSUED AND FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2012
  • DocketNOTE: PROOF OF SERVICE REQUIRED BEFORE ISSUANCE OFWRIT/ABSTRACT (ISSUE 30 DAYS AFTER SERVICE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2012
  • Docket--AND ACCRUED INTEREST OF $4,527.50 AND COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT IN THE SUM OF $0.00 FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 12/20/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION FOR ATTORNEY FEES PURSUANT TO CIVIL CODE 1717.5 FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2002
  • DocketDEFAULT JUDGMENT PACKET RECEIVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 06/27/2002 OF DISCOVER BANK AS TO NATHAN GRAY FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 06/27/2002 OF DISCOVER BANK RETURNED AND FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 06/27/2002 OF DISCOVER BANK AS TO NATHAN GRAY; MAILING DATE OF 08/02/02 FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2002
  • DocketNON-PROOF OF SERVICE (NON-APPEARANCE) HEARING; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY(S) MADE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2002
  • DocketNON PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 9/03/02 AT 8:00 IN DEPT CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2002
  • DocketDIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 07 FOR ALL PURPOSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIMITED CIVIL - GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT UNDER $10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant