This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/11/2018 at 14:51:22 (UTC).

DIAZ VS REYES

Case Summary

On 07/15/2015 DIAZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against REYES. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8297

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ENRIQUE ANTONIO DIAZ

Defendants and Cross Defendants

JUAN RENE REYES

UNIQUE CARE & TRUCKS INC

MOISES MARTINEZ

BENEDICTO GONZALEZ

JAMES MICHAEL SCOTT

KIMBERLY SCOTT

CHRISTIE GIBSON

RRM PROPERTIES LTD

ROBERTSON TRANSPORTATION LSE

ROBERTSON'S TRANSPORT, LTD.

ROBERTSONS TRANSPORT LTD

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

BENEDICTO GONZALEZ

JAMES MICHAEL SCOTT

KIMBERLY SCOTT

ROBERTSON'S TRANSPORT, LTD.

13 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

PARKER, LARRY H.

350 San Antonio Drive

Long Beach, CA 90807

BISH LAW

22505 Market St #104

Newhall, CA 91321

LAW OFFICES OF LARRY H PARKER

350 San Antonio Drive

Long Beach, CA 90807

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

TYSON & MENDES LLP

5661 La Jolla Blvd

La Jolla, CA 92130

RAFFALOW RHOADS & BRETOI

2280 Wardlow Circle Suite 200

Corona, CA 92880

VIVIAN I SCHWARTZ

560 E Hospitality Lane #350

San Bernardino, CA 92408-3545

LAW OFFICES OF CHRISTOPHER B FUSELIER

200 South Main St #200

Corona, CA 92882

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92507.

SUMMONS FILED.

SUMMONS FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 07/15/2015 OF ENRIQUE DIAZ AS TO JUAN RENE REYES; MAILING DATE OF 08/18/15 FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILE

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 08/18/2015 OF BENEDICTO GONZALEZ BY JAMES MICHAEL SCOTT, KIMBERLY SCOTT REPRESENTED BY VIVIAN I SCHWARTZ FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 07/1

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 07/15/2015 OF ENRIQUE DIAZ BY CHRISTIE GIBSON, ROBERTSON'S TRANSPORT, LTD. REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICES OF CHRISTOPHER B FUSELIER FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILE

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 09/02/2015 OF ROBERTSON'S TRANSPORT, LTD. BY JAMES MICHAEL SCOTT, KIMBERLY SCOTT REPRESENTED BY VIVIAN I SCHWARTZ FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILE

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 09/02/2015 OF ROBERTSON'S TRANSPORT, LTD. BY BENEDICTO GONZALEZ REPRESENTED BY RAFFALOW RHOADS & BRETOI FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY E

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY ENRIQUE ANTONIO DIAZ FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NO

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NO

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 08/18/2015 OF BENEDICTO GONZALEZ AS TO JUAN RENE REYES; MAILING DATE OF 02/14/16 FILED.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 07/1

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 07/15/2015 OF ENRIQUE DIAZ BY JUAN RENE REYES REPRESENTED BY TYSON & MENDES LLP FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CHRISTIE GIBSON, ROBERTSON'S TRANSPORT, LTD.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY BENEDICTO GONZALEZ

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY JUAN RENE REYES

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY JAMES MICHAEL SCOTT, KIMBERLY SCOTT

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2017
  • RETURNED DOCUMENT: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE SUBMITTED BY ENRIQUE ANTONIO DIAZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • HEARING RESERVED FOR: APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS - RES56510; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • RETURNED DOCUMENT: APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS SUBMITTED BY BENEDICTO GONZALEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • COPY OF ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE RIC1508297; RIC1508251 DESIGNATED AS THE MASTER FILE; HONORABLE JUDGE SUNSHINE S SYKES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING WHY DISMISSAL ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 07/15/2015 OF ENRIQUE DIAZ AS TO ANY DEFTS/X-DEFTS SHOULD NOT BE ORDERED UNLESS AN ANSWER OR DEFAULT SHALL HAVE BEEN FILED PRIOR TO 05/18/16; Disposition: Off-Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING WHY DISMISSAL ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 08/18/2015 OF BENEDICTO GONZALEZ AS TO ANY DEFTS/X-DEFTS SHOULD NOT BE ORDERED UNLESS AN ANSWER OR DEFAULT SHALL HAVE BEEN FILED PRIOR TO 05/18/16; Disposition: Off-Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING WHY DISMISSAL ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 08/28/2015 OF JAMES SCOTT AS TO ANY DEFTS/X-DEFTS SHOULD NOT BE ORDERED UNLESS AN ANSWER OR DEFAULT SHALL HAVE BEEN FILED PRIOR TO 05/18/16; Disposition: Off-Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING WHY DISMISSAL ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 09/02/2015 OF ROBERTSON'S TRANSPORT, LTD. AS TO ANY DEFTS/X-DEFTS SHOULD NOT BE ORDERED UNLESS AN ANSWER OR DEFAULT SHALL HAVE BEEN FILED PRIOR TO 05/18/16; Disposition: Off-Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
66 More Docket Entries
  • 07/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 07/15/2015 OF ENRIQUE DIAZ AS TO JAMES MICHAEL SCOTT; MAILING DATE OF 07/21/15 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 07/15/2015 OF ENRIQUE DIAZ AS TO KIMBERLY SCOTT; MAILING DATE OF 07/21/15 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • --AND PROOF OF SERVICE OF STATEMENT OF DAMAGES SERVED ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 07/15/2015 OF ENRIQUE DIAZ SERVED ON CHRISTIE GIBSON WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/19/15 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • --AND PROOF OF SERVICE OF STATEMENT OF DAMAGES SERVED ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 07/15/2015 OF ENRIQUE DIAZ SERVED ON ROBERTSON TRANSPORTATION LSE WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/19/15 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 07/15/2015 OF ENRIQUE DIAZ SERVED ON ROBERTSON TRANSPORTATION LSE WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/19/15 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 07/15/2015 OF ENRIQUE DIAZ SERVED ON CHRISTIE GIBSON WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/19/15 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92507.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 06. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less