Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/26/2016 at 08:09:53 (UTC).

DEUTSCHE BANK VS IBARRA

Case Summary

On 07/18/2013 DEUTSCHE BANK filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against IBARRA. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Blythe Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0169

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Blythe Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY

Defendants

EVA IBARRA

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF LESZIEVE

18377 Beach Blvd Ste 210

Huntington Beach, CA 92648

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92225.

SUMMONS ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER C

SUMMONS ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/18/2013 OF DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY FILED

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, U

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/18/2013 OF DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO EVA IBARRA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/18/13 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/18/2013 OF DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; AND MAILED ON 07/22/13 FILED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT A

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/18/2013 OF DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TO EVA IBARRA, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT BY DE

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY FILED.

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK F

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER POSSESSION FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES FILED

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY.

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SA

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SATISFIED; RIVERSIDE COUNTY

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SATISFIED; RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2013
  • DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2013
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER POSSESSION FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/18/2013 OF DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TO EVA IBARRA, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/18/2013 OF DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; AND MAILED ON 07/22/13 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/18/2013 OF DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO EVA IBARRA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/18/13 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2013
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2013
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 9/03/13 AT 8:00 IN CUD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/18/2013 OF DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92225.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2013
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 260 (UNLAWFUL DETAINER BLYTHE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2013
  • PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION ATTACHED TO THE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee, in Trust for Registered Holders of Long Beach Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-6, Asset-backed Certificates, Series 2006-6 is a litigant