This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 08/05/2016 at 16:28:56 (UTC).

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL VS LARAOS

Case Summary

On 03/06/2015 DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against LARAOS. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Banning Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0085

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Banning Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY

Defendants

JULIO LARAOS

JULIO LARIOS

Other

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF LESZIEVE

30 Corporate Park Suite 450

Irvine, CA 92606

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (BANNING)

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92223.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/06/2015 OF DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO JULIO LARAOS; AND MAILED ON 03/09/15 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, U

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/06/2015 OF DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION SERVED ON ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S) BY POSTING AND MAILING ON DATE OF 03/09/15.

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/06/2015 OF DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO JULIO LARIOS; AND MAILED ON 03/09/15 FILED.

AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLA

AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/06/2015 OF DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AND FILED.

1ST AMENDED UNLAWFUL DETAINER

1ST AMENDED UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT OF DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY FILED. (LIMITED CIVIL AMENDED COMPLAINT)

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2015
  • DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • 1ST AMENDED UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT OF DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY FILED. (LIMITED CIVIL AMENDED COMPLAINT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/06/2015 OF DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2015
  • RETURNED DOCUMENT: 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT SUBMITTED BY DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/06/2015 OF DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO JULIO LARIOS; AND MAILED ON 03/09/15 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/06/2015 OF DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION SERVED ON ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S) BY POSTING AND MAILING ON DATE OF 03/09/15.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/06/2015 OF DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO JULIO LARAOS; AND MAILED ON 03/09/15 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2015
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2015
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 5/05/15 AT 8:00 IN BCLRK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92223.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2015
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT B1 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (BANNING)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (BANNING)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee, in Trust for Registered Holders of Long Beach Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-6, Asset-backed Certificates, Series 2006-6 is a litigant