This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 08/04/2016 at 12:41:36 (UTC).

DESERT PALMS ELECTRIC VS LENNON PLACE

Case Summary

On 10/14/2014 DESERT PALMS ELECTRIC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LENNON PLACE. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5453

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DESERT PALMS ELECTRIC INC

Defendants

LENNON PLACE LLC

JACK'S BODY WORKS INC

BRANDON WOOD

JERRY KROPACEK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF THOMAS B MCCULLOUGH

401 Wilshire Blvd Penthouse 12Th Floor

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF STEVEN J DEDINA

35-900 Bob Hope Drive Suite 215

Rancho Mirage, CA 92270

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (P

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (PALM SPRINGS)

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92260.

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEP

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS2. (PALM SPRINGS)

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED 10

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED 10/14/2014 OF DESERT PALMS ELECTRIC INC BY LENNON PLACE LLC, BRANDON WOOD, JACK'S BODY WORKS INC, JERRY KROPACEK REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICES OF STEVEN J DEDINA FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 10/14/2014 OF DESERT PALMS ELECTRIC INC SERVED ON JACK'S BODY WORKS INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 11/18/14 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 10/14/2014 OF DESERT PALMS ELECTRIC INC SERVED ON JERRY KROPACEK WITH SERVICE DATE OF 11/24/14 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 10/14/2014 OF DESERT PALMS ELECTRIC INC SERVED ON LENNON PLACE LLC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 11/18/14 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 10/14/2014 OF DESERT PALMS ELECTRIC INC SERVED ON BRANDON WOOD WITH SERVICE DATE OF 11/18/14 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

OPPOSITION TO DEFTS DEMURRER T

OPPOSITION TO DEFTS DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT BY DESERT PALM ELECTRIC INC FILED

NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DE

NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER BY LENNON PLACE LLC, BRANDON WOOD, JACK'S BODY WORKS INC, JERRY KROPACEK FILED.

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES I

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER BY LENNON PLACE LLC JACKS BODY WORKDS BRANDON WOOD.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CL

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF DESER

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF DESERT PALMS ELECTRIC INC FILED. (AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUPERIOR COURT)

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS BY

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS BY DESERT PALMS ELECTRIC INC FILED.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY D

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY DESERT PALMS ELECTRIC INC FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLA

DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF DESERT PALMS ELECTRIC INC BY LENNON PLACE LLC, BRANDON WOOD, JACK'S BODY WORKS INC, JERRY KROPACEK REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICES OF STEVEN J DEDINA FILED.

OPPOSITION TO DEFTS DEMURRER T

OPPOSITION TO DEFTS DEMURRER TO PLTFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT BY DESERT PALMS ELECTRIC INC FILED

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2016
  • DocketHEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(B).; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • DocketRETURN TO COURT'S CONTROL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • DocketTRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING REGARDING DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE (CRC RULE 3.1385).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED - UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT CRC 3.1385 [FORM CM 200].

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • DocketHEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(B) SET ON 3/24/16 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT PS2.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • DocketFAX FILING BY DESERT PALMS ELECTRIC INC ($1.50 PER PAGE).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE BY LENNON PLACE LLC, BRANDON WOOD, JACK'S BODY WORKS INC, JERRY KROPACEK FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • DocketFAX FILING BY LENNON PLACE LLC ($1.50 PER PAGE).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
55 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2015
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE FEE PAID BY JACKS BODY WORKS INC (ON-LINE RESERVATION).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2015
  • DocketON-LINE MOTION RESERVED ON BEHALF OF ALL DEFENDANTS.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2015
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE FEE PAID BY JERRY KROPACEK (ON-LINE RESERVATION).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2015
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE FEE PAID BY LENNON PLACE LLC (ON-LINE RESERVATION).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2015
  • DocketCOURT REPORTER HEARING FEE FOR ONE HOUR OR LESS PAID BY ALL DEFENDANTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $30.00; FOR HEARING RESERVED FOR MOTION FOR DEMURRER ON 02/04/2015.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2015
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE FEE PAID BY BRANDON WOOD (ON-LINE RESERVATION).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS2. (PALM SPRINGS)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92260.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (PALM SPRINGS)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less