Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/25/2021 at 20:31:48 (UTC).

DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK VS VALENCIA

Case Summary

On 07/20/2020 DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against VALENCIA. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Candice Garcia-Rodrigo. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3352

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Murrieta Southwest Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Candice Garcia-Rodrigo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK

Defendant

PAOLA VALENCIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUNT & HENRIQUES

Attorney at HUNT & HENRIQUES

151 Bernal Rd #8

San Jose, CA 95119-1306

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing

03/25/2021: Certificate of Mailing

Application and Order to Set Aside Judgment Due to Defendant's Bankruptcy and for Dismissal and Order Thereon on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK

03/25/2021: Application and Order to Set Aside Judgment Due to Defendant's Bankruptcy and for Dismissal and Order Thereon on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK

Request for Dismissal on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK

03/25/2021: Request for Dismissal on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

03/16/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Judgment By Clerk By Default on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK

01/20/2021: Judgment By Clerk By Default on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK

Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment on the Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK as to PAOLA VALENCIA filed.

10/13/2020: Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment on the Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK as to PAOLA VALENCIA filed.

Declaration of Counsel Re: 1. Interest 2. Costs (CCP 1033) 3. Attorney Fees

10/13/2020: Declaration of Counsel Re: 1. Interest 2. Costs (CCP 1033) 3. Attorney Fees

System Generated Notice re: Notice of Department Assignment.

07/20/2020: System Generated Notice re: Notice of Department Assignment.

Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK and filed.

07/20/2020: Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK and filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

07/20/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92585.

07/20/2020: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92585.

System Generated Notice re: Notice of Order to Show Cause Hearing.

07/20/2020: System Generated Notice re: Notice of Order to Show Cause Hearing.

Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Under $10,000. CRC 3.740 filed. (Southwest)

07/20/2020: Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Under $10,000. CRC 3.740 filed. (Southwest)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be issued against Plaintiff for Failure to file Default Judgment pursuant to CRC 3.740 (Southwest); Judicial Officer: Assigned Judge; Location/Courtroom: Department S102; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • HearingType: Court Ruling re:; Judicial Officer: Candice Garcia-Rodrigo; Location/Courtroom: Department S102; Disposition: Held - Other pre-disposition hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Dismissal on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Application and Order to Set Aside Judgment Due to Defendant's Bankruptcy and for Dismissal and Order Thereon on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court Ruling re:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Continuance of Hearing or Case Management-Stipulation and Order-Service by Posting or Publication; Amount: $20.00; Paid: $20.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 03/23/2021; Fine Description: Check #184488 Receipt No.: 20210323-00591.1; Paid: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketStatus: Receive and Forward; Description: APPL/ORDER TO SET ASIDE JUDGMENT on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK; Filed By: DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed By: DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration of Counsel Re: 1. Interest 2. Costs (CCP 1033) 3. Attorney Fees; Filed By: DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on the Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK served on PAOLA VALENCIA with service date of 08/09/20 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited complaint or other first paper amount up to $10,000 (GC70613B); Amount: $255.00; Paid: $255.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/20/2020; Fine Description: Check #2900 Receipt No.: CV200720-0373-CK.1; Paid: $255.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: Notice of Department Assignment.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: Notice of Order to Show Cause Hearing.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92585.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK and filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Under $10,000. CRC 3.740 filed. (Southwest)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketFilings: Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK; Disposition: Court Ordered Dismissal 03/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK is a litigant