Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 09/09/2020 at 12:09:40 (UTC).

DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK VS KASPEREEN

Case Summary

On 07/20/2020 DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KASPEREEN. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Hall Of Justice located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3175

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK

Defendant

ANTHONY N KASPEREEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUNT & HENRIQUES

151 Bernal Rd #8

San Jose, CA 95119-1306

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PRE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT (COLLECTIONS - CORONA) FILED 07/20/2020 OF DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK SERVED ON ANTHONY N KASPEREEN WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/07/20 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

LIMITED CIVIL-GENERAL CIVIL CO

LIMITED CIVIL-GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT FOR COLLECTIONS UNDER $10,000. CRC 3.740 FILED. (CORONA)

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92503-6552.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (C

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (COLLECTIONS - CORONA) FILED 07/20/2020 OF DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK AND FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OF

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OF

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2021
  • HearingDept: C1; Action text: HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE ISSUED AGAINST PLAINTIFF FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.74 (CORONA); Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketHEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE ISSUED AGAINST PLAINTIFF FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.74 (CORONA); Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT (COLLECTIONS - CORONA) FILED 07/20/2020 OF DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK SERVED ON ANTHONY N KASPEREEN WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/07/20 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketCOLLECTION CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT C1. (CORONA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIMITED CIVIL-GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT FOR COLLECTIONS UNDER $10,000. CRC 3.740 FILED. (CORONA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET 10/20/21 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT C1.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketCOMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED (COLLECTION) (CORONA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92503-6552.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (COLLECTIONS - CORONA) FILED 07/20/2020 OF DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less