This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/29/2016 at 08:59:13 (UTC).

DEMISSIE VS HOWARD

Case Summary

On 03/13/2014 DEMISSIE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against HOWARD. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Banning Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0264

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BELETE DEMISSIE

Beaumont, CA 92223

Defendants

DESMOND HOWARD

Beaumont, CA 92223

ANDREA MALOID

Beaumont, CA 92223

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL BY COURT

JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL BY COURT; HONORABLE JUDGE JORGE C. HERNANDEZ FILED.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OF

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER TRIAL.

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY BELETE DEMISSIE - BANNING (FORM UD-150).

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/13/2014 OF BELETE DEMISSIE AS TO DESMOND HOWARD; MAILING DATE OF 03/15/14 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWF

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/13/2014 OF BELETE DEMISSIE SERVED ON ANDREA MALOID WITH SERVICE DATE OF 03/13/14 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF AN

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF ANSWER TO UD ON BELETE DEMISSIE WITH A MAILING DATE OF 03/18/14 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY DESMOND HOWARD IS GRANTED; CLERK CATANO (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY ANDREA MALOID IS GRANTED; CLERK CATANO (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER CO

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/13/2014 OF BELETE DEMISSIE BY DESMOND HOWARD, ANDREA MALOID REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

170.6 FILED BY BELETE DEMISSIE

170.6 FILED BY BELETE DEMISSIE AGAINST JUDGE SAMUEL DIAZ GRANTED.

SUMMONS FILED.

SUMMONS FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92223.

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED - BANNING

LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINE

LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2014
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL OF CASE - BANNING; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL BY COURT; HONORABLE JUDGE JORGE C. HERNANDEZ FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2014
  • COURT TRIAL UNLAWFUL DETAINER - BANNING; Disposition: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER TRIAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2014
  • COURT TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER SET FOR 4/09/14, AT 13:30 IN DEPT. B1.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY BELETE DEMISSIE - BANNING (FORM UD-150).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/13/2014 OF BELETE DEMISSIE AS TO DESMOND HOWARD; MAILING DATE OF 03/15/14 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/13/2014 OF BELETE DEMISSIE SERVED ON ANDREA MALOID WITH SERVICE DATE OF 03/13/14 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF ANSWER TO UD ON BELETE DEMISSIE WITH A MAILING DATE OF 03/18/14 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2014
  • FEE WAIVER FOR ANDREA MALOID WAS GRANTED FOR ANSWER TO UD; $255.00 WAIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2014
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY ANDREA MALOID (FORM FW-001).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY ANDREA MALOID IS GRANTED; CLERK CATANO (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/13/2014 OF BELETE DEMISSIE BY DESMOND HOWARD, ANDREA MALOID REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • 170.6 FILED BY BELETE DEMISSIE AGAINST JUDGE SAMUEL DIAZ GRANTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92223.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2014
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED - BANNING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2014
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE SET 5/14/14 AT 13:30 IN DEPT. B1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less