This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/17/2018 at 11:13:17 (UTC).

DEMARCO VS ALL IN

Case Summary

On 03/07/2017 DEMARCO filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against ALL IN. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0408

  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Murrieta Southwest Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAMES R DEMARCO

Defendant

ALL IN CONSULTING INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JACKSON TIDUS A LAW CORPORATION

2030 Main St #1200

Irvine, CA 92614

Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF JAMES DEAGUILERA

2068 Orange Tree Lane #218

Redlands, CA 92335

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY JAMES R DEMARCO.

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER OVER $25,000 (SOUTHWEST)

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92590.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DET

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/07/2017 OF JAMES DEMARCO AND FILED.

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE BY ALL

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE BY ALL IN CONSULTING INC FILED.

DEMURRER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER

DEMURRER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/07/2017 OF JAMES DEMARCO BY ALL IN CONSULTING INC REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICES OF JAMES DEAGUILERA FILED. (OVER $25,000)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWF

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/07/2017 OF JAMES DEMARCO SERVED ON ALL IN CONSULTING INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 03/14/17 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER BY JAME

OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER BY JAMES R DEMARCO FILED

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FI

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY JAMES R DEMARCO.

NOTICE OF TAKING DEMURRER OFF

NOTICE OF TAKING DEMURRER OFF CALENDAR BY ALL IN CONSULTING INC FILED.

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER CO

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/07/2017 OF JAMES DEMARCO BY ALL IN CONSULTING INC REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICES OF JAMES DEAGUILERA FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY JAMES R DEMARCO - SOUTHWEST (FORM UD-150).

STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGM

STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED 05/17/17; SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY JAMES R DEMARCO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • COURT TRIAL UNLAWFUL DETAINER - SOUTHWEST.; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • RETURNED DOCUMENT: WRIT OF POSSESSION SUBMITTED BY JAMES R DEMARCO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED 05/17/17; SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER FEE PAID BY JAMES R DEMARCO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY JAMES R DEMARCO - SOUTHWEST (FORM UD-150).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • COURT TRIAL UNLAWFUL DETAINER SET 5/26/17 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. S205 (SOUTHWEST).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • RETURNED DOCUMENT: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT SUBMITTED BY JAMES R DEMARCO.

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 03/20/2017
  • RETURNED DOCUMENT: DEMURRER SUBMITTED BY ALL IN CONSULTING INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE BY ALL IN CONSULTING INC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 5/08/17 AT 8:00 IN CLES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/07/2017 OF JAMES DEMARCO AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92590.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER OVER $25,000 (SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT S205 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less