This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 02/02/2017 at 20:21:27 (UTC).

DELGADILLO VS RODRIGUEZ

Case Summary

On 10/12/2016 DELGADILLO filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against RODRIGUEZ. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1821

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOLEDAD DELGADILLO

Defendant

BEATRIZ RODRIGUEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF WILLIAM E WINDHAM

308 N Riverside Ave #2E

Rialto, CA 92376

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED UN

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED UNSATISFIED

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY SOLEDAD DELGADILLO.

JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT

JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK.

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECO

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 11/15/16 S205 JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK).

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: UN

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: UNLAWFUL DETAINER TRIAL.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 10/12/2016 OF SOLEDAD DELGADILLO REMOVE ATTORNEY PRO/PER FOR PARTY(S) SOLEDAD DELGADILLO AND REPLACE WITH ATTORNEY LAW OFFICES OF WILLIAM E WINDHAM

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY SOLEDAD DELGADILLO - SOUTHWEST (FORM UD-150).

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY BEATRIZ RODRIGUEZ IS GRA; CLERK M LOPEZ (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER CO

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 10/12/2016 OF SOLEDAD DELGADILLO BY BEATRIZ RODRIGUEZ REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY SOLEDAD DELGADILLO IS GRANTED; HONORABLE JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DET

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 10/12/2016 OF SOLEDAD DELGADILLO AND FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92571.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(SOUTHWEST)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2016
  • DocketDATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED UNSATISFIED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY SOLEDAD DELGADILLO.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 11/15/16 S205 JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • DocketCOURT TRIAL UNLAWFUL DETAINER - SOUTHWEST.; Disposition: Judgment Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • DocketCOURT TRIAL UNLAWFUL DETAINER - SOUTHWEST.; Disposition: Continued Not Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: UNLAWFUL DETAINER TRIAL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 10/12/2016 OF SOLEDAD DELGADILLO REMOVE ATTORNEY PRO/PER FOR PARTY(S) SOLEDAD DELGADILLO AND REPLACE WITH ATTORNEY LAW OFFICES OF WILLIAM E WINDHAM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 10/12/2016
  • DocketFEE WAIVER RETURNED SET 10/14/16 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. FWSW.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • DocketHEARING RE: UD OSC SET 12/12/16 AT 8:00 IN CLES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 10/12/2016 OF SOLEDAD DELGADILLO AND FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92571.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • DocketREQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY SOLEDAD DELGADILLO (FORM FW-001).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(SOUTHWEST)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT S205 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (SOUTHWEST)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less