Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 08/05/2016 at 19:14:03 (UTC).

DE LA VEGA VS REMBERT

Case Summary

On 10/08/2015 DE LA VEGA filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against REMBERT. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Banning Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0353

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Banning Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EDDIE DE LA VEGA

Hemet, CA 92543

Defendant

TANIRRA REMBERT

Banning, CA 92220

Other

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (BANNING)

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92220.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

170.6 FILED BY EDDIE DE LA VEG

170.6 FILED BY EDDIE DE LA VEGA AGAINST JUDGE SAMUEL DIAZ GRANTED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 10/08/2015 OF EDDIE DE LA VEGA AS TO TANIRRA REMBERT FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, U

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 10/08/2015 OF EDDIE DE LA VEGA AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO TANIRRA REMBERT WITH SERVICE DATE OF 10/08/15 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE)

MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT ON

MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 10/08/2015 OF EDDIE DE LA VEGA AS TO TANIRRA REMBERT REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY TANIRRA REMBERT IS GRANTED; CLERK CMUNDO (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 10/08/2015 OF EDDIE DE LA VEGA AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 10/08/15 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT A

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 10/08/2015 OF EDDIE DE LA VEGA AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR R

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY EDDIE DE LA VEGA.

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK -

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 11/19/15

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SA

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SATISFIED; RIVERSIDE COUNTY

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SATISFIED; RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 11/19/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY EDDIE DE LA VEGA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2015
  • HEARING RE: MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 10/08/2015 OF EDDIE DE LA VEGA AS TO TANIRRA REMBERT; Disposition: Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • RETURNED DOCUMENT: APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT/JUDGMENT/WRIT SUBMITTED BY EDDIE DE LA VEGA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 10/08/2015 OF EDDIE DE LA VEGA AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 10/08/2015 OF EDDIE DE LA VEGA AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 10/08/15 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 10/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 10/08/2015 OF EDDIE DE LA VEGA AS TO TANIRRA REMBERT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • 170.6 FILED BY EDDIE DE LA VEGA AGAINST JUDGE SAMUEL DIAZ GRANTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 12/07/15 AT 8:30 IN BCLRK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92220.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (BANNING)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT B201 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (BANNING)

    Read MoreRead Less