This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 08/13/2020 at 17:45:10 (UTC).

DE ANDA VS STATE OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT

Case Summary

On 11/08/2016 DE ANDA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against STATE OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GLORIA CONNOR TRASK. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4885

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

GLORIA CONNOR TRASK

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GABRIELA GARCIA CARBAJAL

SILVINO DE ANDA JR

Claimant

ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

WALSH CONSTRUCTIONGROUP LLC

CITY OF RIVERSIDE

URS CORPORATION

CLARK CONSTRUCTIONGROUP LLC

SEQUOIA CONSULTANTS INC

ACTUANT CORPORATION

STATE OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENTOF TRANSPORT

AECOM TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION

STATE OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENTOF

ATKINS-WALSH JOINTVENTURE

MOES 1-50

RIVERSIDE COUNTY TRANSPORTATION COMMISSION

ATKINSON-WALSH JOINT VENTURE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HERZOG YUHAS EHRLICH & ARDELL

11400 West Olympic Blvd #1150

Los Angeles, CA 90064-1585

Claimant Attorney

MORALES FIERRO & REEVES

2300 Contra Costa Blvd #310

Pleasant Hill, CA 94523

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

G& P SCHICK

3170 Fourth Ave Ste. 400

San Diego, CA 92103

DANIELS, FINE, ISRAEL, SCHONBUCH & LEBOVITS

1801 Century Park East 9Th Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90057

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE BY SEQU

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE BY SEQUOIA CONSULTANTSINC FILED.

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF SEQUOIA CON

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF SEQUOIA CONSULTANTSINC REPRESENTED BY G&P SCHICK FILED (SUPERIOR COURT)

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (R

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92879.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FI

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 11/08/2016 OF SILVINO DE ANDA AND FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 11/08/2016 OF SILVINO DE ANDA AS TO STATE OF CALIFORNIADEPARTMENTOF TRANSPORT; MAILING DATE OF 12/12/16 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 11/08/2016 OF SILVINO DE ANDA SERVED ON CITY OF RIVERSIDE WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/07/16 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 11/08/2016 OF SILVINO DE ANDA SERVED ON ACTUANT CORPORATION WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/07/16 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 11/08/2016 OF SILVINO DE ANDA SERVED ON AECOM TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/07/16 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 11/08/2016 OF SILVINO DE ANDA SERVED ON CLARK CONSTRUCTIONGROUP LLC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/07/16 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 11/0

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 11/08/2016 OF SILVINO DE ANDA BY SEQUOIA CONSULTANTSINC REPRESENTED BY G&P SCHICK FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

NOTICE OF LIEN FILED ON COMPLA

NOTICE OF LIEN FILED ON COMPLAINT FILED 11/08/2016 OF SILVINO DE ANDA AGAINST SILVINO DE ANDA JR BY ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OS

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OSC WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 11/08/2016 OF SILVINO DE ANDA SERVED ON WALSH CONSTRUCTIONGROUP LLC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/07/16 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY

DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY REGARDING MEET AND CONFER FILED BY CLARK CONSTRUCTIONGROUP LLC, WALSH CONSTRUCTIONGROUP LLC PURSUANT TO CCP 430.41 (FORM CIV-140).

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 11/0

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 11/08/2016 OF SILVINO DE ANDA BY ACTUANT CORPORATION REPRESENTED BY DANIELS, FINE, ISRAEL, SCHONBUCH & LEBOVITS FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF ACTUANT COR

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF ACTUANT CORPORATION REPRESENTED BY DANIELS, FINE, ISRAEL, SCHONBUCH & LEBOVITS FILED (SUPERIOR COURT)

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS COMPLA

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 01/30/2017 OF ACTUANT CORPORATION AND FILED.

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2017
  • DocketRETURNED DOCUMENT: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS SUBMITTED BY SILVINO DE ANDA JR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • DocketRETURNED DOCUMENT: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS SUBMITTED BY SILVINO DE ANDA JR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • DocketHEARING RESERVED FOR DEMURRER ON MOTION FOR DEMURRER - RES65246.; Disposition: Off-Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • DocketHEARING RESERVED FOR: PETITION FOR RELIEF FROM GOVERNMENT TORT CLAIM REQ. - RES65084; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • DocketSILVINO DE ANDA JR, GABRIELA GARCIA CARBAJAL/HERZOG YUHAS EHRLICH & ARDELL IS ORDERED TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE, IF ANY, WHY SANCTIONS NOT TO EXCEED $1500.00 OR DISMISSAL SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON ALL PARTIES.; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • DocketCOURT REPORTER HEARING FEE FOR ONE HOUR OR LESS PAID BY CLARK CONSTRUCTION GROUP AND WALSH CONSTRUCTION GROUP IN THE AMOUNT OF $30.00; FOR HEARING RESERVED FOR MOTION FOR DEMURRER ON 04/26/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • DocketON-LINE MOTION RESERVED ON BEHALF OF CLARK CONSTRUCTION GROUP AND WALSH CONSTRUCTION GROUP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • DocketHEARING RESERVED FOR DEMURRER ON 04/26/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT 07 - RES65246.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • DocketCOURT REPORTER FEE (UNDER ONE HOUR) PAID BY PLAINTIFFS FOR HEARING 04/20/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 11/08/2016 OF SILVINO DE ANDA SERVED ON AECOM TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/07/16 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 11/08/2016 OF SILVINO DE ANDA SERVED ON CLARK CONSTRUCTIONGROUP LLC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/07/16 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 11/08/2016 OF SILVINO DE ANDA AS TO STATE OF CALIFORNIADEPARTMENTOF; MAILING DATE OF 12/12/16 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 07. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • DocketJURY FEE DEPOSIT OF $150.00 PAID BY SILVINO DE ANDA JR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY SILVINO DE ANDA JR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • DocketNON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 1/09/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92879.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 11/08/2016 OF SILVINO DE ANDA AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AECOM TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where SEQUOIA CONSULTANTS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where WALSH CONSTRUCTIONGROUP LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where URS CORPORATION is a litigant