This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/27/2016 at 13:41:02 (UTC).

DAVID C WERNER VS FORREST W BREHM

Case Summary

On 05/09/2013 DAVID C WERNER filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FORREST W BREHM. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Indio Larson Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3053

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2013

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indio Larson Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DAVID C WERNER

Rancho Mirage, CA 92270

LAW OFFICES OF DAVID C WERNER

35-900 Bob Hope Drive Suite 105

Rancho Mirage, CA 92270

Defendants

WILDOMAR 91 LLC

LAUREL LLC

BREHM-CANYON LAKE LLC

BLACKMORE RANCH-MURRIETALP

EMERALD VALLEY-NORCO LP

WILDOMAR RIVERSIDELP

SHERIDAN-TEMECULA LP

LAUREL RIDGE - EL CAJON LP

LAKE ELSINORE - CANYON LAKE LP

FORREST W BREHM

BREHM COMMUNITIES

LAKE HILLS LLC

BREHM-MORENO VALLEY LLC

BREHM BUILDERS INC

BLACKMORE LLC

BREHM-EMERALD VALLEY LLC

BREHM HOMES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF DAVID C WERNER

35-900 Bob Hope Drive Suite 105

Rancho Mirage, CA 92270

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92270.

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/09/2013 OF DAVID CWERNER FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 05/09/2013 OF DAVID CWERNER SERVED ON BREHM COMMUNITIES WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/20/13 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 05/09/2013 OF DAVID CWERNER SERVED ON LAKE HILLS LLC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/20/13 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 05/09/2013 OF DAVID CWERNER SERVED ON BREHM-MORENO VALLEYLLC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/20/13 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 05/09/2013 OF DAVID CWERNER SERVED ON BREHM BUILDERS INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/20/13 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 05/09/2013 OF DAVID CWERNER SERVED ON BLACKMORE LLC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/20/13 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 05/09/2013 OF DAVID CWERNER SERVED ON BREHM HOMES INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/20/13 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 05/09/2013 OF DAVID CWERNER SERVED ON LAUREL LLC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/20/13 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 05/09/2013 OF DAVID CWERNER SERVED ON BREHM-CANYON LAKE LLC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/20/13 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 05/09/2013 OF DAVID CWERNER SERVED ON BLACKMORE RANCH-MURRIETALP WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/20/13 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 05/09/2013 OF DAVID CWERNER SERVED ON EMERALD VALLEY-NORCO LP WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/20/13 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 05/09/2013 OF DAVID CWERNER SERVED ON WILDOMAR RIVERSIDELP WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/20/13 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 05/09/2013 OF DAVID CWERNER SERVED ON SHERIDAN-TEMECULA LP WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/20/13 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 05/09/2013 OF DAVID CWERNER SERVED ON LAUREL RIDGE - EL CAJON LP WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/20/13 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 05/09/2013 OF DAVID CWERNER SERVED ON LAKE ELSINORE - CANYON LAKE LP WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/20/13 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FI

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED ON 06/21/13 BY DAVID CWERNER WAS CORRECTED NUNC PRO TUNC ON 07/16/13.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF NUNC PRO TUNC.

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2013
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF NUNC PRO TUNC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED ON 06/21/13 BY DAVID CWERNER WAS CORRECTED NUNC PRO TUNC ON 07/16/13.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2013
  • NUNC PRO TUNC HEARING SET FOR 7/16/13 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 2H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2013
  • NUNC PRO TUNC HEARING; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2013
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE (NON-APPEARANCE) HEARING; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS - ENTIRE CASE ARBITRATION OF ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS BY FORREST W BREHM FILED (FORM CM-180).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 05/09/2013 OF DAVID CWERNER SERVED ON LAKE ELSINORE - CANYON LAKE LP WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/20/13 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 05/09/2013 OF DAVID CWERNER SERVED ON LAUREL RIDGE - EL CAJON LP WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/20/13 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 05/09/2013 OF DAVID CWERNER SERVED ON SHERIDAN-TEMECULA LP WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/20/13 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 06/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 05/09/2013 OF DAVID CWERNER SERVED ON BLACKMORE LLC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/20/13 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 05/09/2013 OF DAVID CWERNER SERVED ON BREHM BUILDERS INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/20/13 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 05/09/2013 OF DAVID CWERNER SERVED ON BREHM-MORENO VALLEYLLC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/20/13 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 05/09/2013 OF DAVID CWERNER SERVED ON LAKE HILLS LLC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/20/13 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 05/09/2013 OF DAVID CWERNER SERVED ON BREHM COMMUNITIES WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/20/13 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 05/09/2013 OF DAVID CWERNER SERVED ON FORREST W BREHM WITH SERVICE DATE OF 05/16/13 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/09/2013 OF DAVID CWERNER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 2H FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92270.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less