This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 01/05/2018 at 21:38:55 (UTC).

DAUTO PADILLA & LOPEZ

Case Summary

On 04/25/2017 DAUTO PADILLA LOPEZ was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1652

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

REFUGIO ELIAS DAUTO PADILLA

Riverside, CA 92503

Respondent

FRANCISCA LOPEZ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2017
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION FILED BY REFUGIO ELIAS DAUTO PADILLA. (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • JUDGMENT FOR DISSOLUTION BY DECLARATION FILED BY REFUGIO ELIAS DAUTO PADILLA; JUDGE CHAD W FIRETAG. (FL-180)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED - DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 10/31/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • JUDGMENT FORWARDED TO DEPARTMENT F501 FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW ON 06/01/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • JUDGMENT PACKET RECEIVED ON 05/31/17 AND FORWARDED TO THE JUDGMENT DESK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ON THE DISSOLUTION WITHOUT CHILD(REN) FILED 04/25/2017 OF REFUGIO DAUTO PADILLA AS TO FRANCISCA LOPEZ FILED. (FL-165/FL-620)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF PRELIMINARY & FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY REFUGIO ELIAS DAUTO PADILLA. (FL-141)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • --ALSO SERVED COMP/BLK:INC/EXP DEC,DEC OF RES ON FRANCISCA LOPEZ WITH SERVICE DATE OF 04/30/17--

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • --ALSO SERVED FAMILY LAW CASE MGMT ORDER ON FRANCISCA LOPEZ WITH SERVICE DATE OF 04/30/17--

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT DATE RE: DEFAULT/RESPONSE SET ON 7/03/17 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. CLER

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 04/25/2017
  • HEARING RE: FAILURE TO BRING CASE TO TRIAL/JUDGMENT SET 4/25/22 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. CLER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • HEARING RE: NON PROOF OF SERVICE SET ON 4/24/20 AT 8:00 IN DEPT CLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT DATE RE: PROOF OF SERVICE SET ON 6/26/17 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. CLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • SUMMONS FILED - DISSOLUTION WITHOUT CHILD(REN) FILED 04/25/2017 OF REFUGIO DAUTO PADILLA (FL-110/FL-210/FL-510)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • DECLARATION OF RESIDENCE FILED BY REFUGIO ELIAS DAUTO PADILLA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT F501 (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • PETITION FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • PETITIONER'S PLACE OF RESIDENCE RIVERSIDE, 92503

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • DATE OF MARRIAGE (PETITIONER): 12/09/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • DATE OF SEPARATION (PETITIONER): 04/21/17.

    Read MoreRead Less