This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/20/2017 at 11:54:49 (UTC).

DANIELS VS MCGLYNN

Case Summary

On 03/20/2017 DANIELS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MCGLYNN. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0470

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Murrieta Southwest Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KAREN MARIE DANIELS

Hemet, CA 92543

Defendants

MICHAEL BROWN

KARAN MCGLYNN

Canyon Lake, CA 92587

Other

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(SOUTHWEST)

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92587.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DET

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/20/2017 OF KAREN DANIELS AND FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, U

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/20/2017 OF KAREN DANIELS AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO MICHAEL BROWN WITH SERVICE DATE OF 03/21/17 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/20/2017 OF KAREN DANIELS AS TO MICHAEL BROWN FILED.

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR POST

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; HONORABLE JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK FILED.

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER CO

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/20/2017 OF KAREN DANIELS BY KARAN MCGLYNN REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF AN

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF ANSWER ON KAREN MARIE DANIELS WITH A MAILING DATE OF 04/07/17 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/20/2017 OF KAREN DANIELS AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO KARAN MCGLYNN; AND MAILED ON 04/05/17 FILED.

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY KAREN MARIE DANIELS - SOUTHWEST (FORM UD-150).

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/20/2017 OF KAREN DANIELS AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S) FILED.

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/20/2017 OF KAREN DANIELS AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 04/05/17 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2017
  • DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • COURT TRIAL UNLAWFUL DETAINER - SOUTHWEST.; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/20/2017 OF KAREN DANIELS AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 04/05/17 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/20/2017 OF KAREN DANIELS AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY KAREN MARIE DANIELS - SOUTHWEST (FORM UD-150).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • COURT TRIAL UNLAWFUL DETAINER SET 5/05/17 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. S205 (SOUTHWEST).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/20/2017 OF KAREN DANIELS AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO KARAN MCGLYNN; AND MAILED ON 04/05/17 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF ANSWER ON KAREN MARIE DANIELS WITH A MAILING DATE OF 04/07/17 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/20/2017 OF KAREN DANIELS BY KARAN MCGLYNN REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/20/2017 OF KAREN DANIELS AS TO MICHAEL BROWN FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/20/2017 OF KAREN DANIELS AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO MICHAEL BROWN WITH SERVICE DATE OF 03/21/17 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 5/19/17 AT 8:00 IN CLES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/20/2017 OF KAREN DANIELS AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92587.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT S205 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less