This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/04/2019 at 00:44:35 (UTC).

DAMAVANDI VS AUTO CLUB

Case Summary

On 10/04/2019 DAMAVANDI filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AUTO CLUB. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Banning Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0176

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KAREN DAMAVANDI

Beaumont, CA 92223

MEHRDAD DAMAVANDI

Beaumont, CA 92223

Defendants

ZURICH AMERICA INSURANCE

1299 Zurich Way

Schaumberg, IL 60196

AUTO CLUB ENTERPRISES

3333 Fariview Road

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - MORE THAN

PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - MORE THAN $5000 BUT LESS THAN OR EQUAL TO $10,000 BY NATURAL PERSONS ONLY FILED (BANNING).

PROOF OF SERVICE-SMALL CLAIMS

PROOF OF SERVICE-SMALL CLAIMS ON THE PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - BANNING FILED 10/04/2019 OF MEHRDAD DAMAVANDI SERVED ON ZURICH AMERICA INSURANCE WITH SERVICE DATE OF 10/25/19 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE) SERVICE FEE OF $75.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE-SMALL CLAIMS

PROOF OF SERVICE-SMALL CLAIMS ON THE PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - BANNING FILED 10/04/2019 OF MEHRDAD DAMAVANDI SERVED ON AUTO CLUB ENTERPRISES WITH SERVICE DATE OF 10/24/19 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE) SERVICE FEE OF $85.00.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2019
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • RULING ON MATTER SUBMITTED 12/02/19 RE: SMALL CLAIMS COMPLAINT; Disposition: Court's Ruling on Submitted Matter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING - BANNING; Disposition: Taken Under Submissio

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE-SMALL CLAIMS ON THE PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - BANNING FILED 10/04/2019 OF MEHRDAD DAMAVANDI SERVED ON AUTO CLUB ENTERPRISES WITH SERVICE DATE OF 10/24/19 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE) SERVICE FEE OF $85.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE-SMALL CLAIMS ON THE PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - BANNING FILED 10/04/2019 OF MEHRDAD DAMAVANDI SERVED ON ZURICH AMERICA INSURANCE WITH SERVICE DATE OF 10/25/19 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE) SERVICE FEE OF $75.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING SET 12/02/19, AT 13:30, IN B201

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • CLAIM AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED - BANNING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • ACTIVE MILITARY DUTY AS TO NONE (BANNING)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • SMALL CLAIMS CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT B201. (BANNING)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - MORE THAN $5000 BUT LESS THAN OR EQUAL TO $10,000 BY NATURAL PERSONS ONLY FILED (BANNING).

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AUTO CLUB ENTERPRISES GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases where Zurich American Insurance Company is a litigant