This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 11/02/2016 at 05:50:05 (UTC).

CUTHERS CONSTRUCTUION INC VS SEPULVEDA COMMERICAL

Case Summary

On 05/23/2006 CUTHERS CONSTRUCTUION INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SEPULVEDA COMMERICAL. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0240

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2006

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff

CUTHERS CONSTRUCTION INC

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

SEPULVEDA COMMERCIAL DEVELOPMENT CORP

CONTRACTORS BONDING AND INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorney

PICOZZI, EDWARD M

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

ERAMO, MARTIN P

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ORDER CONSOLIDATING

NOTICE OF ORDER CONSOLIDATING AND TRANSFERRING CASE TO THE SUPERIOR COURT OF SAN BERNARDINO BY SEPULVEDA COMMERCIAL DEVELOPMENT CORP FILED.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY C

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY CUTHERS CONSTRUCTION INC FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 212(G)(1)

GENERAL DENIAL TO CROSS COMPLA

GENERAL DENIAL TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 07/31/2006 OF SEPULVEDA COMMERCIAL DEVELOPMENT CORP BY CUTHERS CONSTRUCTION INC REPRESENTED BY EDWARD M PICOZZI FILED.

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF SEPULVEDA C

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF SEPULVEDA COMMERCIAL DEVELOPMENT CORP REPRESENTED BY MARTIN P ERAMO FILED (SUPERIOR COURT)

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 05/2

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 05/23/2006 OF CUTHERS CONSTRUCTION INC BY SEPULVEDA COMMERCIAL DEVELOPMENT CORP, CONTRACTORS BONDINGAND INSURANCE COMPANY REPRESENTED BY MARTIN P ERAMO FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 05/23/2006 OF CUTHERS CONSTRUCTION INC SERVED ON SEPULVEDA COMMERCIAL DEVELOPMENT CORP WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/15/06 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 05/23/2006 OF CUTHERS CONSTRUCTION INC AS TO TRANSCAN RIVERSIDELLC, TRANSCAN DEVELOPMENT LLC FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 05/23/2006 OF CUTHERS CONSTRUCTION INC SERVED ON CONTRACTORS BONDINGAND INSURANCE COMPANY WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/09/06 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

ORIGINAL SUMMONS FILED

ORIGINAL SUMMONS FILED

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - S

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2010
  • DocketPAPER RECORDS DESTROYED/DIGITALLY ARCHIVED. PAPER DOCUMENTS/FILE DESTROYED IN ACCORDANCE WITH ADMINISTRATIVE POLICY/RECORDS MANAGEMENT A.10.400.1, PAPER RECORDS RETENTION AND DESTRUCTION SCHEDULE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2007
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Off-Calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ORDER CONSOLIDATING AND TRANSFERRING CASE TO THE SUPERIOR COURT OF SAN BERNARDINO BY SEPULVEDA COMMERCIAL DEVELOPMENT CORP FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2007
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2006
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2006
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY CUTHERS CONSTRUCTION INC FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 212(G)(1)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2006
  • DocketUNTIMELY CMS FAX FILED BY EDWARD M PICOZZI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY CUTHERS CONSTRUCTION INC FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 212(G)(1)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2006
  • DocketCALENDARED ON CLERK'S CALENDAR FOR TRACKING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2006
  • DocketNON-PROOF OF SERVICE (NON-APPEARANCE) HEARING; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/31/2006
  • Docket--ALSO SERVED CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 07/31/2006 OF SEPULVEDA COMMERCIAL DEVELOPMENT CORP ON CUTHERS CONSTRUCTION INC WITH DATE OF MAILING 07/28/06--

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCROSS-COMPLAINT OF SEPULVEDA COMMERCIAL DEVELOPMENT CORP REPRESENTED BY MARTIN P ERAMO FILED (SUPERIOR COURT)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 05/23/2006 OF CUTHERS CONSTRUCTION INC BY SEPULVEDA COMMERCIAL DEVELOPMENT CORP, CONTRACTORS BONDINGAND INSURANCE COMPANY REPRESENTED BY MARTIN P ERAMO FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 05/23/2006 OF CUTHERS CONSTRUCTION INC SERVED ON SEPULVEDA COMMERCIAL DEVELOPMENT CORP WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/15/06 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 05/23/2006 OF CUTHERS CONSTRUCTION INC AS TO TRANSCAN RIVERSIDELLC, TRANSCAN DEVELOPMENT LLC FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 05/23/2006 OF CUTHERS CONSTRUCTION INC SERVED ON CONTRACTORS BONDINGAND INSURANCE COMPANY WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/09/06 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2006
  • DocketNON PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 8/16/06 AT 8:00 IN DEPT CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2006
  • DocketDIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 01 FOR ALL PURPOSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL SUMMONS FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less