Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 03/23/2017 at 06:25:22 (UTC).

CRUZ VS HERNANDEZ

Case Summary

On 11/28/2016 CRUZ filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against HERNANDEZ. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Moreno Valley Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4299

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Moreno Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VERONICA CRUZ

Moreno Valley, CA 92555

Defendant

MARGARITA HERNANDEZ

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(MORENO VALLEY)

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DET

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 11/28/2016 OF VERONICA CRUZ AND FILED.

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92555.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY VERONICA CRUZ IS GRANTED; HONORABLE JUDGE MARK E PETERSEN (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWF

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 11/28/2016 OF VERONICA CRUZ SERVED ON MARGARITA HERNANDEZ WITH SERVICE DATE OF 11/28/16 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR R

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT A

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 11/28/2016 OF VERONICA CRUZ AS TO MARGARITA HERNANDEZ

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY VERONICA CRUZ.

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK -

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 12/06/16

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2017
  • DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 12/06/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY VERONICA CRUZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 11/28/2016 OF VERONICA CRUZ AS TO MARGARITA HERNANDEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 11/28/2016 OF VERONICA CRUZ SERVED ON MARGARITA HERNANDEZ WITH SERVICE DATE OF 11/28/16 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • INITIAL FEE WAIVER FOR VERONICA CRUZ TO BE RETURNED BY 12/01/16. (CLERK'S CALENDAR); Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY VERONICA CRUZ IS GRANTED; HONORABLE JUDGE MARK E PETERSEN (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • FEE WAIVER FOR VERONICA CRUZ WAS GRANTED FOR FIRST FILING FEE; $270.00 WAIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • FEE WAIVER RETURNED SET 12/01/16 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. FWMV.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY VERONICA CRUZ (FORM FW-001).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92555.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 1/27/17 AT 8:00 IN CLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 11/28/2016 OF VERONICA CRUZ AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(MORENO VALLEY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT MV1UD - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (MORENO VALLEY)

    Read MoreRead Less