This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 08/02/2016 at 21:17:03 (UTC).

CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU VS TRIPLE J CONTRACTIN

Case Summary

On 06/20/2013 CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TRIPLE J CONTRACTIN. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Indio Larson Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3956

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indio Larson Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Respondents

CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU INC

DAVID CASPERS

Defendants and Appellants

TRIPLE J CONTRACTING INC

FDBA PACIFIC COASTWALL SYSTEMS INC

AFDBA WESTERN STATES INTERIORSINC

AFDBA FOOTHILLPAINT INC

DAVID CASPERS

Not Classified By Court

COURT OF APPEAL FOURTH APPELLATE DISTRICT

Riverside, CA 92501

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorneys

FREED, KENNETH J.

14226 Ventura Boulevard

Sherman Oaks, CA 91413

LAW OFFICES OF KENNETH J FREED

14226 Ventura Blvd Po Box 5914

Sherman Oaks, CA 91423

BRADSHAW, VINCENT C

372 N May Ave

Monrovia, CA 91016

ROVER ARMSTRONG APC

75100 Mediterranean

Palm Desert, CA 92211

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

LAROCCA, PHILLIP R

74998 Country Club Dr 220-393

Palm Desert, CA 92260

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

ROVER ARMSTRONG APC

75100 Mediterranean

Palm Desert, CA 92211

LAW OFFICES OF PHILLIP R LAROCCA

36901 Cook Street Suite 8-242

Palm Desert, CA 92211

LAROCCA, PHILLIP R

74998 Country Club Dr 220-393

Palm Desert, CA 92260

Not Classified By Court Attorney

COURT OF APPEAL FOURTH DISTRICT

3389 12Th Street

Riverside, CA 92501

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - S

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 06/

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 06/20/2013 OF CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU INC FILED

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 06/2

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 06/20/2013 OF CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU INC BY TRIPLE J CONTRACTING INC, DAVID CASPERS REPRESENTED BY ROVER ARMSTRONG APC FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BY CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU INC FILED.

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BY CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU INC FILED.

TRIAL BRIEF FILED BY CREDITORS

TRIAL BRIEF FILED BY CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU INC

EXHIBITS LIST BY CREDITORS ADJ

EXHIBITS LIST BY CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU

MOTION IN LIMINE RE: /FOR ORDE

MOTION IN LIMINE RE: /FOR ORDER THAT AUDITORS FINDINGS & INVOICE SHALL BE TAKEN BY CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU FILED.

FILED: WITNESS LIST BY CREDITO

FILED: WITNESS LIST BY CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU

FILED: EXHIBIT LIST

FILED: EXHIBIT LIST

RECEIPT FOR EXHIBITS FILED BY

RECEIPT FOR EXHIBITS FILED BY EXHIBITS CLERK FROM DEPARTMENT PS3.

RECEIPT FOR RECORDS ON APPEAL

RECEIPT FOR RECORDS ON APPEAL FILED - APPEAL PACKET RECEIVED BY DCA.

NOTIFICATION OF FILING NOTICE

NOTIFICATION OF FILING NOTICE OF APPEAL.

NOTICE OF DEFAULT ON APPEAL IS

NOTICE OF DEFAULT ON APPEAL ISSUED AS TO TRIPLE J CONTRACTING INC FOR FAILURE TO FILING DEPOSIT CRC RULE 8.100(B)(2) FILED. (SUPERIOR COURT)

RECEIPT FOR RECORDS ON APPEAL

RECEIPT FOR RECORDS ON APPEAL FILED - E062022.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT ON

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT ON APPEAL ENTERED AS TO TRIPLE J CONTRACTING INC FOR FAILURE TO PAY FILING FEE FILED. (SUPERIOR COURT).

REMITTITUR FROM COURT OF APPEA

REMITTITUR FROM COURT OF APPEAL FILED; RULING APPEAL DISMISSED E062022; JUSTICE COURT OF APPEAL, JUSTICE, RAMIREZ.

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFA

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FOR JUDGMENT DEBTOR, TRIPLE J CONTRACTING INC, DAVID CASPERS FILED.

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FOR JUDGMENT DEBTOR, TRIPLE J CONTRACTING INC, DAVID CASPERS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2015
  • CLERK'S CALENDAR - REVIEW EXHIBIT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2014
  • COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION - APPEALS DISMISSAL BEFORE CERTIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2014
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSITION - APPEALS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REMITTITUR FROM COURT OF APPEAL FILED; RULING APPEAL DISMISSED E062022; JUSTICE COURT OF APPEAL, JUSTICE, RAMIREZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT OF APPEAL APPEAL IS DISMISSED FAILURE TO PAY FEES E062022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT FOR RECORDS ON APPEAL FILED - NTC OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT PKT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT ON APPEAL ENTERED AS TO TRIPLE J CONTRACTING INC FOR FAILURE TO PAY FILING FEE FILED. (SUPERIOR COURT).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT FOR RECORDS ON APPEAL FILED - E062022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DEFAULT ON APPEAL ISSUED AS TO TRIPLE J CONTRACTING INC FOR FAILURE TO FILING DEPOSIT CRC RULE 8.100(B)(2) FILED. (SUPERIOR COURT)

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 11/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; ON COMPLAINT FILED 06/20/2013 OF CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU INC REMOVE ATTORNEY ROVER ARMSTRONG APC FOR PARTY(S) TRIPLE J CONTRACTING INC AND REPLACE WITH ATTORNEY LAW OFFICES OF PHILLIP R LAROCCA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2013
  • DEFAULT DEPARTMENT CHANGED TO PS2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 06/20/2013 OF CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU INC BY TRIPLE J CONTRACTING INC, DAVID CASPERS REPRESENTED BY ROVER ARMSTRONG APC FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 06/20/2013 OF CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU INC AS TO DAVID CASPERS; MAILING DATE OF 07/15/13 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 06/20/2013 OF CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU INC AS TO TRIPLE J CONTRACTING INC; MAILING DATE OF 07/15/13 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 06/20/2013 OF CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU INC FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92111.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 2H FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less