Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 05/04/2021 at 12:46:51 (UTC).

CRAIG vs DOBSON

Case Summary

On 07/20/2020 CRAIG filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against DOBSON. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Daniel Ottolia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2736

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Not Yet Classified

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Daniel Ottolia

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MICHAEL CRAIG

Defendants

STACY DOBSON

GAYLE MARROCCO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE BARNES FIRM LC

633 West Fifth Street Suite 1750

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Defendant Attorney

Scott Brian Spriggs

 

Court Documents

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint of MICHAEL CRAIG

05/03/2021: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint of MICHAEL CRAIG

Notice of Posting Jury Fees.

04/23/2021: Notice of Posting Jury Fees.

Certificate of Mailing

01/13/2021: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

01/13/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Declaration of Howard S Blumenthal for the OSC re Failure to file Proof of Service

01/12/2021: Declaration of Howard S Blumenthal for the OSC re Failure to file Proof of Service

Case Management Statement

12/29/2020: Case Management Statement

Answer to Complaint on Complaint of MICHAEL CRAIG

12/15/2020: Answer to Complaint on Complaint of MICHAEL CRAIG

Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint of MICHAEL CRAIG

12/02/2020: Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint of MICHAEL CRAIG

System Generated Notice re: OSC WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED.

10/26/2020: System Generated Notice re: OSC WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED.

Summons Issued on Complaint of CRAIG and filed.

07/20/2020: Summons Issued on Complaint of CRAIG and filed.

Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92570.

07/20/2020: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92570.

System Generated Notice re: Ntc of Dept Assignmt For All Purposes and Ntc of CMC.

07/20/2020: System Generated Notice re: Ntc of Dept Assignmt For All Purposes and Ntc of CMC.

Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Riverside)

07/20/2020: Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Riverside)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference Hearing (Riverside); Judicial Officer: Daniel Ottolia; Location/Courtroom: Department 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint of MICHAEL CRAIG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Jury Fee Deposit; Amount: $150.00; Paid: $150.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 04/26/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *6199 Receipt No.: 20210426-00668.1; Paid: $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Posting Jury Fees.; Filed By: MICHAEL CRAIG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference Hearing (Riverside); Judicial Officer: Daniel Ottolia; Location/Courtroom: Department 4; Disposition: Continued Hearing Not Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • HearingType: MICHAEL CRAIG/THE BARNES FIRM LC is ordered to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions not to exceed $1500.00 or Dismissal should not be imposed for failure to file FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON ALL PARTIES.; Judicial Officer: Daniel Ottolia; Location/Courtroom: Department 4; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • HearingType: Court on its Own Motion; Judicial Officer: Daniel Ottolia; Location/Courtroom: Department 4; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Posting Jury Fees. on Complaint of MICHAEL CRAIG; Filed By: STACY DOBSON; GAYLE MARROCCO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint of MICHAEL CRAIG; Filed By: MICHAEL CRAIG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: OSC WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/21/2020; Fine Description: Check Bank Adjustment #6199 Receipt No.: CV200721-0293-FE.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint of CRAIG and filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92570.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: Ntc of Dept Assignmt For All Purposes and Ntc of CMC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Riverside)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketFilings: Complaint of MICHAEL CRAIG

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SPRIGGS SCOTT B.