This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 09/03/2021 at 22:36:20 (UTC).

COWAN VS MYERS

Case Summary

On 11/02/2020 COWAN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MYERS. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0716

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Palm Springs Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JEFFREY R COWAN

Cathedral City, CA 92234

Defendants

LAVRIE J MYERS

Murrieta, CA 92562

LAURIE J MYERS

 

Court Documents

Minute Order: Hearing on Small Claims

04/05/2021: Minute Order: Hearing on Small Claims

Certificate of Mailing Small Claims Notice of Entry of Judgment on Plaintiff's Claim (Palm Springs) of JEFFREY R COWAN

04/05/2021: Certificate of Mailing Small Claims Notice of Entry of Judgment on Plaintiff's Claim (Palm Springs) of JEFFREY R COWAN

Declaration of Defendant Laurie L. Myers in Opposition to Small Claims Complaint

04/01/2021: Declaration of Defendant Laurie L. Myers in Opposition to Small Claims Complaint

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

02/05/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Notice of Case Reassignment to Department

02/05/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment to Department

Notice of Telephonic Appearance on Plaintiff's Claim (Palm Springs) of JEFFREY R COWAN

02/05/2021: Notice of Telephonic Appearance on Plaintiff's Claim (Palm Springs) of JEFFREY R COWAN

Request to Postpone Small Claims Hearing on Plaintiff's Claim (Palm Springs) of JEFFREY R COWAN

01/12/2021: Request to Postpone Small Claims Hearing on Plaintiff's Claim (Palm Springs) of JEFFREY R COWAN

Notice of Telephonic Appearance re: SMALL CLAIMS set on 01/20/21 at 8:30 in Department MV2.

11/02/2020: Notice of Telephonic Appearance re: SMALL CLAIMS set on 01/20/21 at 8:30 in Department MV2.

Plaintiff's Claim - Under $1500 filed. (Palm Springs)

11/02/2020: Plaintiff's Claim - Under $1500 filed. (Palm Springs)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing on Small Claims; Judicial Officer: Assigned Judge; Location/Courtroom: Department PS4; Disposition: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing on Small Claims; Judicial Officer: Assigned Judge; Location/Courtroom: Department PS4; Disposition: Continued Hearing Not Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • JudgementStatus: Entered; Type: Money; Applies to: Plaintiff's Claim (Palm Springs) of JEFFREY R COWAN; For/Against: For - JEFFREY R COWAN Against - LAURIE J MYERS; Details; Principal: $325.00; Costs: $30.00; Accrued Interest: $0.00; Offset(-): $0.00; Subtotal Judgment: $355.00; Total: $355.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: 10-Year Judgment Expiration; Expiration Date: 04/05/2031; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Hearing on Small Claims

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Certificate of Mailing Small Claims Notice of Entry of Judgment on Plaintiff's Claim (Palm Springs) of JEFFREY R COWAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration of Defendant Laurie L. Myers in Opposition to Small Claims Complaint; Filed By: LAURIE J MYERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • HearingType: Court on its Own Motion; Judicial Officer: Assigned Judge; Location/Courtroom: Department PS4; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Telephonic Appearance on Plaintiff's Claim (Palm Springs) of JEFFREY R COWAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Reassignment to Department

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • HearingType: Small Claims Hearing - Moreno Valley; Location/Courtroom: Department MV2; Disposition: Reset

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Order on Request to Postpone Small Claims Hearing on Plaintiff's Claim (Palm Springs) of JEFFREY R COWAN; Filed By: LAURIE J MYERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Request to Postpone Small Claims Hearing; Amount: $10.00; Paid: $10.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/13/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *1997 Receipt No.: 20210113-00251.1; Paid: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketStatus: Receive and Forward; Description: Request to postpone trial & order on request on Plaintiff's Claim (Palm Springs) of JEFFREY R COWAN; Filed By: LAURIE J MYERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request to Postpone Small Claims Hearing on Plaintiff's Claim (Palm Springs) of JEFFREY R COWAN; Filed By: LAURIE J MYERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: Notice of Telephonic Appearance re: SMALL CLAIMS set on 01/20/21 at 8:30 in Department MV2.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Plaintiff's Claim - Under $1500 filed. (Palm Springs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketFilings: Plaintiff's Claim (Palm Springs) of JEFFREY R COWAN; Disposition: Contested Judgment 04/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Small Claims filing claim for $1,500 or less (CCP116.230B1); Amount: $30.00; Paid: $30.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/28/2020; Fine Description: Check #1157 Receipt No.: CV201103-0057-CK.1; Paid: $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less