This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 06/17/2020 at 09:04:11 (UTC).

COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE VS CHURCH UNLIMITED

Case Summary

On 04/08/2020 COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE filed an Other lawsuit against CHURCH UNLIMITED. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2064

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Palm Springs Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

Defendants

CHURCH UNLIMITED

JAMES MOFFATT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEPUTY COUNTY COUNSEL

3960 Orange Street Suite 500

Riverside, CA 92501

 

Court Documents

ORDER GRANTING IN PART & DENYI

ORDER GRANTING IN PART & DENYING EXPARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; HONORABLE JUDGE JOHN VINEYARD.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT.

DECLARATION OF JAMES MOFFATT F

DECLARATION OF JAMES MOFFATT FILED

PETITION ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMEN

PETITION ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS1. (PALM SPRINGS)

PETITION FILED. (PALM SPRINGS)

PETITION FILED. (PALM SPRINGS)

SUMMONS ISSUED ON PETITION FIL

SUMMONS ISSUED ON PETITION FILED 04/08/2020 OF COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE AND FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92201.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NT

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NTC OF DEPT ASSIGNMENT.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

NOTICE OF AND EX PARTE APPLICA

NOTICE OF AND EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND OSC RE ISSUANCE OF PRELIM BY COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE FILED.

DECLARATION OF KELLY A MORAN I

DECLARATION OF KELLY A MORAN IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPL FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2020
  • HearingDept: PS1; Action text: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketEX PARTE HEARING RE TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND OSC.; Disposition: GRANTED IN PART

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING IN PART & DENYING EXPARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; HONORABLE JUDGE JOHN VINEYARD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF JAMES MOFFATT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS1. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION FILED. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ON PETITION FILED 04/08/2020 OF COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92201.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NTC OF DEPT ASSIGNMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF AND EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND OSC RE ISSUANCE OF PRELIM BY COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF KELLY A MORAN IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketFILING FEE OF $480.00 FOR COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE IS WAIVED-EXEMPT PER GOVT CODE 6103

    Read MoreRead Less