This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 03/11/2019 at 23:50:50 (UTC).

CORTEZ VS CAPITAL AUTO FINANCIAL

Case Summary

On 04/16/2018 CORTEZ filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CAPITAL AUTO FINANCIAL. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6979

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

ANGELICA CORTEZ

HORACIO SANTOSSANCHEZ

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

CAPITAL AUTO FINANCIAL INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

THE SADR LAW FIRM

1455 Frazee Rd., Ste. 500

San Diego, CA 92108

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

LEBEDEV MICHAEL & HELMI

10999 Riverside Dr #201

Studio City, CA 91602

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FI

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/16/2018 OF ANGELICA CORTEZ AND FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92860.

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (R

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF CAPITAL AUT

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF CAPITAL AUTO FINANCIAL INC REPRESENTED BY LEBEDEV MICHAEL & HELMI FILED (SUPERIOR COURT)

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 04/1

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 04/16/2018 OF ANGELICA CORTEZ BY CAPITAL AUTO FINANCIAL INC REPRESENTED BY LEBEDEV MICHAEL & HELMI FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/16/2018 OF ANGELICA CORTEZ AS TO CAPITAL AUTO FINANCIAL INC; MAILING DATE OF 05/04/18 FILED.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OS

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OSC WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED.

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILE

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 07/18/2018 OF CAPITAL AUTO FINANCIAL INC BY ANGELICA CORTEZ, HORACIO SANTOSSANCHEZ REPRESENTED BY THE SADR LAW FIRM FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CL

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY A

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY ANGELICA CORTEZ, HORACIO SANTOSSANCHEZ FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY C

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY CAPITAL AUTO FINANCIAL INC FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PRE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO COMPLAINT FILED 04/16/2018 OF ANGELICA CORTEZ FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2019
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 07/18/2018 OF CAPITAL AUTO FINANCIAL INC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO COMPLAINT FILED 04/16/2018 OF ANGELICA CORTEZ FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Off-Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • COURT ON ITS OWN MOTION: THE HEARING SET FOR 10/15/18 IS ADVANCED TO TODAY; Disposition: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY ANGELICA CORTEZ, HORACIO SANTOSSANCHEZ FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY CAPITAL AUTO FINANCIAL INC FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • FAX FILING BY CAPITAL AUTO FINANCIAL INC ($2.00 PER PAGE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • ANGELICA CORTEZ, HORACIO SANTOSSANCHEZ/THE SADR LAW FIRM IS ORDERED TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE, IF ANY, WHY SANCTIONS NOT TO EXCEED $1500.00 OR DISMISSAL SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON ALL PARTIES.; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2018
  • OSCFF HEARING SET FOR 08/21/18 AT 08:30 IS VACATED -FOR THE REASON: POS AS TO ALL DEFTS FILED AS OF 06/26/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • NPSCTH HEARING SET FOR 06/18/18 AT 08:30 IS VACATED -FOR THE REASON: OSC RE:SANCTIONS SET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET 8/21/18 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 01.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OSC WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE CLERK'S TRACKING HEARING (NON-APPEARANCE); Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 6/18/18 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/16/2018 OF ANGELICA CORTEZ AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92860.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 10. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAPITAL AUTO FINANCIAL INC. (DOE 2) is a litigant